Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2905942

EP2905942 - APPLICATION POPULARIZATION METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2019/03]
Former [2015/33]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / FAN, Xuhua
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2015/33]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2015/33]
Application number, filing date13850877.528.08.2013
[2015/33]
WO2013CN82492
Priority number, dateCN20121041952329.10.2012         Original published format: CN201210419523
[2015/33]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014067333
Date:08.05.2014
Language:ZH
[2014/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2905942
Date:12.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2905942
Date:16.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN08.05.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08, H04W4/50, H04W4/60, G06F8/60
[2018/42]
Former International [2015/43]H04L29/08, H04W4/00, G06F9/445
Former International [2015/33]H04L29/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR ANWENDUNGSBEVÖLKERUNG[2018/42]
English:APPLICATION POPULARIZATION METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM[2015/33]
French:PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE POPULATION D'APPLICATIONS[2018/42]
Former [2015/33]VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR ANWENDUNGSPOPULARISIERUNG
Former [2015/33]PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE VULGARISATION D'APPLICATIONS
Entry into regional phase04.05.2015Translation filed 
04.05.2015National basic fee paid 
04.05.2015Search fee paid 
04.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
04.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/33]
31.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.2018Fee for grant paid
07.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.04.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
24.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
[2019/38]
Former [2019/37]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL16.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2288113  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 7,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0063]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0097]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0101]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0120] * * figure 2E * [I] 1-6,8-12;
 [I]US2008301231  (MEHTA SAMIR NARENDRA [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0097]; figures 1, 4-7 *;
 [XI]EP1130495  (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [X] 7,13 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0039]; figures 3,4 * [I] 1-6,8-12;
 [XI]WO2008017907  (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,7,13 * page 2 * * page 10, line 9 - line 13 * [I] 2-6,8-12
International search[X]CN102546605  (BEIJING RUIXUN LINGTONG TECHNOLOGY CO LTD);
 [A]CN102163311  (KAI LI);
 [A]WO2010075890  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al)