Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2915603

EP2915603 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SEPARATING LIQUID ABSORBENT FIBERS OF AN ABSORBENT ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/37]METHOD FOR SEPARATING AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING MATERIAL PERTAINING TO ABSORBENT ARTICLE
[2018/38]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 16.01.2019  [2019/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Shimobun
Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime 799-0111 / JP
[2015/37]
Inventor(s)01 / HAYASHI, Tomoki
c/o Unicharm Corporation
Technical Center
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
02 / OYAMA, Hidetaka
c/o Unicharm Corporation
Technical Center
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
03 / KAGAWA, Masashi
c/o Unicharm Corporation
Technical Center
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
 [2015/37]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[2019/03]
Former [2015/37]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date13851534.124.10.2013
[2015/37]
WO2013JP78798
Priority number, dateJP2012024305402.11.2012         Original published format: JP 2012243054
[2015/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014069322
Date:08.05.2014
Language:JA
[2014/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2915603
Date:09.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2915603
Date:16.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.05.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:B29L31/48, B07B1/00, B29K105/26, B07B1/20, B07B4/02, B07B4/08, B07B9/00, B07B15/00, B29B17/02, B04B1/10, B07B13/00, B07B1/10
[2018/38]
Former International [2016/30]B09B5/00, A61F13/15, B07B4/08, B29B17/02, D21B1/08, B07B1/10, B02C18/00, D21B1/02, B07B13/00, B07B1/20, B07B4/02, B07B9/00, B07B15/00
Former International [2015/37]B09B5/00, A61F13/15, B07B4/08, B29B17/02, D21B1/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR TRENNUNG VON SAUGFÄHIGEN FASERN EINES SAUGFÄHIGEN GEGENSTANDES[2018/38]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SEPARATING LIQUID ABSORBENT FIBERS OF AN ABSORBENT ARTICLE[2018/38]
French:DISPOSITIF ET METHODE POUR SEPARER DES FIBRES ABSORBANTES CONTENUES DANS UN ARTICLE ABSORBANT[2018/38]
Former [2015/37]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRENNEN VON MATERIAL EINES SAUGFÄHIGEN GEGENSTANDES
Former [2015/37]METHOD FOR SEPARATING AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING MATERIAL PERTAINING TO ABSORBENT ARTICLE
Former [2015/37]PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION ET DISPOSITIF DE SÉPARATION DE MATÉRIAUX FAISANT PARTIE D'UN ARTICLE ABSORBANT
Entry into regional phase16.04.2015Translation filed 
16.04.2015National basic fee paid 
16.04.2015Search fee paid 
16.04.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
16.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/37]
23.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2018Fee for grant paid
04.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.09.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2012083994  (KRONOPLUS TECHNICAL AG [CH], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, lines 1-9; figure 2 * * page 9, line 31 - page 11, line 27; claims 1-15 *;
 [X]US3909397  (ALDINGER KARL E) [X] 1,11 * column 1, line 22 - column 3, line 10; figure 1; claims 1-4 *
International search[A]JPH11235575  (KAO CORP);
 [A]JP2003200147  (DAIKI KK);
 [A]JP2009262088  (UJIIE SEISAKUSHO KK);
 [A]JP2004313878  (TSUKADA UNYU KK)
by applicantJP2001336077