Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2916655

EP2916655 - METHODS FOR DETERMINING IF AN ANIMAL'S METABOLISM IS KETOGENIC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.08.2016
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.09.2016  [2016/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
[2015/38]
Inventor(s)01 / PAN, Yuanlong
2743 Quail Valley Drive
Chesterfield, Missouri 63005 / US
02 / HANNAH, Steven, S.
293 Ridge Trail Court
Chesterfield, Missouri 63017 / US
03 / SUN, Peichuan
5 Crosswinds Drive
St. Louis, Missouri 63132 / US
04 / JACKSON, Janet, R.
1 Tejas Trail
Columbia, Illinois 62236 / US
 [2015/38]
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[2015/38]
Application number, filing date13852513.411.11.2013
[2015/38]
WO2013US69393
Priority number, dateUS201261725202P12.11.2012         Original published format: US 201261725202 P
[2015/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014074972
Date:15.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2916655
Date:16.09.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2014
[2015/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.05.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:A01N43/04, A01N37/02, G01N33/64
[2015/40]
Former International [2015/38]A01N43/04, A01N37/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/38]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER KETOGENESE-FÄHIGKEIT DES STOFFWECHSELS EINES TIERES[2015/38]
English:METHODS FOR DETERMINING IF AN ANIMAL'S METABOLISM IS KETOGENIC[2015/38]
French:PROCÉDÉS POUR DÉTERMINER SI LE MÉTABOLISME D'UN ANIMAL EST CÉTOGÈNE[2015/38]
Entry into regional phase11.05.2015National basic fee paid 
11.05.2015Search fee paid 
11.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
11.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
11.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/38]
30.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/39]
04.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2006118665  (ACCERA INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * pg 8, l 12-21; pg 8, l 31-pg 9, l 4; pg 17, l 24-pg 18, l 2; fig 1. *;
 [I]WO2012113415  (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [I] 1-15 * pg 19, 20, example 4. *
 [XI]  - Vorstand ET AL, "Ketogenese und Pansenfunktion nach intraruminaler Applikation von gesattigten Fettsauren ((28, G o , CE) beim Rind", Vet. Med. A, (19810101), pages 19 - 26, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1111/j.1439-0442.1981.tb01158.x/epdf, (20150729), XP055205180 [X] 1,3,5,6,8,10,11,13,15 * pg 19-20, 23-24; fig 1-3. * [I] 2,4,7,9,12,14
International search[X]US2011178032  (HENDERSON)
 [Y]US4992365  (HYMAN)
 [A]US6410063  (JEWELL ET AL.)
 [A]US5510245  (MAGERS)