Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2917604

EP2917604 - DISC BRAKE PAD MOUNTING AND RETENTION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.08.2015
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bendix Spicer Foundation Brake LLC
901 Cleveland Avenue
Elyria, OH 44035 / US
[2015/38]
Inventor(s)01 / PLANTAN, Ronald, S.
193 Plantation Drive
Morresville, NC 28117 / US
02 / COOL, Lonnie, F.
29370 Vita Lane
North Olmsted, OH 44070 / US
03 / RADHAKRISHNAN, Harish
1506 Crossings Parkway
Westlake, OH 44145 / US
 [2015/39]
Former [2015/38]01 / PLANTAN, Ronald, S.
348 Brittany Lane
Elyria, OH 44035 / US
02 / COOL, Lonnie, F.
29370 Vita Lane
North Olmsted, OH 44070 / US
03 / RADHAKRISHNAN, Harish
1506 Crossings Parkway
Westlake, OH 44145 / US
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/38]Kleine, Hubertus
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date13852569.605.11.2013
[2015/38]
WO2013US68570
Priority number, dateUS20121367340409.11.2012         Original published format: US201213673404
[2015/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014074525
Date:15.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2917604
Date:16.09.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2014
[2015/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.05.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:F16D65/097
[2015/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/38]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHEIBENBREMSBELAGMONTAGE UND -FIXIERUNG[2015/38]
English:DISC BRAKE PAD MOUNTING AND RETENTION SYSTEM AND METHOD[2015/38]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE ET DE RETENUE DE PLAQUETTE DE FREIN À DISQUE[2015/38]
Entry into regional phase03.06.2015National basic fee paid 
28.07.2015Search fee paid 
03.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
03.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/38]
03.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/38]
21.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2015/38]
01.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee
28.07.2015Request for further processing filed
28.07.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.08.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE19610611  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [X] 1-4,6,9-11,13,14,16,18,21,23 * column 4, line 39 - column 5, line 68; figures 3-10 * [Y] 5,7,8,12,13,15,17,19,20,22;
 [X]US6039155  (DEMOISE JR THOMAS EDWIN [US]) [X] 1-4,6,9,10,14,16,18 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 23; figures 1,4,7,8 *;
 [Y]US2009008193  (SEKIYA YOSHIHIDE [JP] ET AL) [Y] 5,12,13,20,22 * figure 5 *;
 [Y]WO2005064191  (FRENI BREMBO SPA [IT]; SCHORN MICHAEL [IT]; TIRONI GIOVANNI MARIO [IT]) [Y] 7,8,15 * figure 15 *;
 [Y]DE102004053026  (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [Y] 17,19 * paragraph [0025]; figure 1 *
International search[X]DE10050013  (KAST ET AL);
 [X]US4134477  (ASQUITH);
 [Y]US2008277215  (KLEMENT ET AL)
by applicantDE19610611