Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2918585

EP2918585 - PYRROLOQUINOLINE QUINONE DISODIUM SALT CRYSTAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zhucheng Haotian Pharm Co., Ltd.
Xinxing Town
Zhucheng, Shandong 262218 / CN
[2015/38]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHU, Liping
Xinxing Town
Zhucheng, Shandong 262218 / CN
02 / LU, Liye
No. 555, Zu Chong Zhi Rd
Pudong Shanghai, 201203 / CN
03 / WANG, Jianrong
NO. 555, Zu Chong Zhi Rd
Pudong Shanghai, 201203 / CN
04 / SUN, Linlin
Room 405, Building 7 West
No. 130, Dong'an Rd.
Shanghai, 200032 / CN
05 / MEI, Xuefeng
No. 555, Zu Chong Zhi Rd
Pudong Shanghai, 201203 / CN
06 / GU, Jianxin
Room 405, Building 7 West
No. 130, Dong'an Rd.
Shanghai, 200032 / CN
 [2017/39]
Former [2017/36]01 / ZHU, Liping
Xinxing Town
Zhucheng, Shandong 262218 / CN
02 / LU, Liye
No. 555, Zu Chong Zhi Rd
Pudong Shanghai, 201203 / CN
03 / WANG, Jianrong
NO. 555, Zu Chong Zhi Rd
Pudong Shanghai, 201203 / CN
04 / SUN, Linlin
Room 405, Building 7 West
No. 103, Dong'an Rd.
Shanghai, 200032 / CN
05 / MEI, Xuefeng
No. 555, Zu Chong Zhi Rd
Pudong Shanghai, 201203 / CN
06 / GU, Jianxin
Room 405, Building 7 West
No. 130, Dong'an Rd.
Shanghai, 200032 / CN
Former [2015/38]01 / ZHU, Liping
Xinxing Town
Zhucheng, Shandong 262218 / CN
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2017/36]
Former [2015/38]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13853342.710.09.2013
[2015/38]
WO2013CN83195
Priority number, dateCN20121045229709.11.2012         Original published format: CN201210452297
[2015/38]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014071772
Date:15.05.2014
Language:ZH
[2014/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2918585
Date:16.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2918585
Date:06.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN15.05.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:C07D471/04, A61K31/4745
[2015/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PYRROLOCHINOLINCHINON-DINATRIUMSALZKRISTALL[2015/38]
English:PYRROLOQUINOLINE QUINONE DISODIUM SALT CRYSTAL[2015/38]
French:CRISTAL DE SEL DISODIQUE DE PYRROLOQUINOLINE QUINONE[2015/38]
Entry into regional phase09.06.2015Translation filed 
09.06.2015National basic fee paid 
09.06.2015Search fee paid 
09.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
09.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.09.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN
09.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/38]
26.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2017Fee for grant paid
27.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.09.2016
Opposition(s)07.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.09.2013
AT06.09.2017
CY06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
IE10.09.2017
LU10.09.2017
MT10.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU10.09.2013
AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
IE10.09.2017
LU10.09.2017
MT10.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/43]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
IE10.09.2017
LU10.09.2017
MT10.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/39]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
IE10.09.2017
LU10.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/36]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
IE10.09.2017
LU10.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/33]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
IE10.09.2017
LU10.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/12]ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/11]ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/09]FI06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
NO06.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
NO06.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT06.09.2017
NO06.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2455379  (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * claim 1 *;
 [A]  - TOSHIMASA ISHIDA ET AL, "Molecular and crystal structure of PQQ (methoxatin), a novel coenzyme of quinoproteins: extensive stacking character and metal ion interaction", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19890801), vol. 111, no. 17, doi:10.1021/JA00199A050, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 6822 - 6828, XP008149475 [A] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00199a050
International search[XP]CN102942567  (ZHUCHENG HAOTIAN PHARM CO LTD);
 [XP]JP2013112677  (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC.);
 [XP]WO2012173217  (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. ET AL.);
 [XP]CN103261197  (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC.);
 [X]JP2011219388  (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC.);
 [X]JP2692167B  (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC.);
 [X]CN101885725  (JIANGSU DAOQI BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD);
 [A]CN102471336  (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC.)
by applicantCN101228963B
    - JACS, JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (198908), vol. 111, no. 17, pages 6822 - 6828
    - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1981), vol. 103, pages 5599 - 5600
    - COREY ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1981), vol. 103, pages 5599 - 5600
    - JACS, vol. 111, pages 6822 - 6828
 CN20108031945