Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2918585 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2918585



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 463
11.07.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
07.09.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
24.08.2017 Correction to published European patent application/patent specification Search / examination 1
10.08.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.07.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
27.07.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
27.07.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
04.05.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.05.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.05.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.05.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 49
04.05.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 49
03.05.2017 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
24.04.2017 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
10.04.2017 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
14.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.02.2017 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
08.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.02.2017 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
08.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
31.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
31.01.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 34
31.01.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
31.01.2017 Description Search / examination 29
31.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
31.01.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
26.09.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
26.09.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.09.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.08.2016 Priority search results Search / examination 3
16.08.2016 Priority search results Search / examination 6
16.08.2016 Priority search results Search / examination 17
16.08.2016 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
27.07.2016 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
28.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.06.2016 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
13.05.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
26.04.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.04.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 1
26.04.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
26.04.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
08.04.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
08.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
17.09.2015 Translation of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 8
19.08.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
22.07.2015 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
20.07.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
09.06.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
09.06.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
09.06.2015 Claims Search / examination 4
09.06.2015 Description Search / examination 34
09.06.2015 Drawings Search / examination 18
09.06.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
19.05.2015 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 20
20.03.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
14.10.2014 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 46
15.05.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
15.05.2014 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 5
15.05.2014 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 46