Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2918585


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019 [2019/47]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
03.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.09.2018  [2018/36]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
13.07.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
19.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
12.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
25.08.2017 Change - inventor published on  27.09.2017  [2017/39]
04.08.2017 (Expected) grant published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
01.08.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
01.08.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
28.07.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
03.05.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.04.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.04.2017 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
10.02.2017 Change - inventor
01.02.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.10.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.09.2016 First examination report
05.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.04.2016 Change - classification published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
22.04.2016 Change - classification published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
22.04.2016 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
15.01.2016 Change - extension states published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
06.10.2015 Change - representative
04.09.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.08.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.09.2015  [2015/38]
14.08.2015 Request for examination filed published on  16.09.2015  [2015/38]
11.08.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
14.07.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
10.06.2015 Amendment by applicant
09.06.2015 Change - representative
09.06.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
15.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
29.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
16.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication