Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2918585 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201210452297 EP13853342



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9695164Global Dossier 04.07.2017B2
US2015291583 15.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013CN83195 10.09.2013
CN201210452297 09.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6103326BGlobal Dossier 29.03.2017B2
JP2016504277 12.02.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2013CN83195 10.09.2013
CN201210452297 09.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2918585Global Dossier 06.09.2017B1
EP2918585 25.05.2016A4
EP2918585 16.09.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013CN83195 10.09.2013
CN201210452297 09.11.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014071772Global Dossier 15.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
CN201210452297 09.11.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN102942567BGlobal Dossier 08.02.2017B
CN102942567 27.02.2013A
Priority number Date
CN201210452297 09.11.2012