Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2917390

EP2917390 - DRY CELLULOSE FILAMENTS AND THE METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.11.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FPInnovations Inc.
570 boul. St-Jean
Pointe-Claire, Québec H9R 3J9 / CA
[2015/38]
Inventor(s)01 / DORRIS, Gilles Marcel
206 Byron
Vimont
Laval, Québec H7K 1R5 / CA
02 / BEN, Yuxia
27 Chambertin
Kirkland, Québec H9H 5E3 / CA
03 / HU, Thomas-Qiuxiong
312-5788 Birney Avenue
Vancouver, British Columbia Y6S 0A2 / CA
04 / NEAULT, Patrick
Rue du Lac
Les Coteaux, Québec J7X 1A2 / CA
 [2015/38]
Representative(s)Green, Mark Charles
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Euston House
24 Eversholt Street
London NW1 1AD / GB
[2019/52]
Former [2015/38]Green, Mark Charles
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP The Podium
1 Eversholt Street
London NW1 2DN / GB
Application number, filing date13853623.007.11.2013
[2015/38]
WO2013CA50853
Priority number, dateUS201261723517P07.11.2012         Original published format: US 201261723517 P
[2015/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014071523
Date:15.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2917390
Date:16.09.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2014
[2015/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2917390
Date:25.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA15.05.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:C08L1/02, D21H17/25, D21H21/18, D21H13/02, C08J5/18
[2016/30]
Former International [2015/38]D01F2/00, C08J5/18, C08L1/02, D21H17/25, D21H21/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:TROCKENE CELLULOSEFILAMENTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2015/38]
English:DRY CELLULOSE FILAMENTS AND THE METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME[2015/38]
French:FILAMENTS DE CELLULOSE SECS ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2015/38]
Entry into regional phase05.06.2015National basic fee paid 
05.06.2015Search fee paid 
05.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA
05.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/38]
16.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2019Fee for grant paid
05.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.11.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
08.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2011026760  (DAICEL CHEM) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
International search[X]WO2012097446  (FPINNOVATIONS [CA], et al);
 [A]US7566014  (KOSLOW EVAN E [US], et al);
 [A]CA2799123  (FPINNOVATIONS [CA])
by applicantWO2012097446