Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2813799 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2813799



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 118
17.10.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
02.10.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 1
02.07.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
04.01.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
25.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.01.2016 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
05.01.2016 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
11.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.12.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
11.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
11.12.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 8
11.12.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
11.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.06.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.06.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.06.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.06.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
27.05.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
27.05.2015 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
12.05.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.05.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
12.05.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
28.04.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
19.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
10.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.11.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.09.2014 Information regarding early processing Search / examination 2
23.07.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
16.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.06.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.06.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
16.06.2014 Description Search / examination 8
16.06.2014 Drawings Search / examination 4
16.06.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
16.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
03.06.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 20
15.05.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
15.05.2014 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
15.05.2014 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 14