Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2813799 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380004624 EP13853873



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104024788Global Dossier 03.09.2014A
Priority number Date
BR102012028900 12.11.2012
WO2013BR00477 07.11.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2813799Global Dossier 10.06.2015A4
EP2813799 17.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
BR102012028900 12.11.2012
WO2013BR00477 07.11.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2014008075 06.10.2014A
Priority number Date
BR102012028900 12.11.2012
WO2013BR00477 07.11.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014071487Global Dossier 15.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
BR102012028900 12.11.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR102012028900 21.10.2014A2
Priority number Date
BR102012028900 12.11.2012