Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813799

EP2813799 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DIMENSIONAL CONTROL OF CONNECTOR TUBES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Whirlpool S.A.
Av. Nações Unidas n°12.995 32° andar Brooklin Novo
São Paulo - SP 04578-000 / BR
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / FISCHER, Roberto
Rua Alceu Koehntopp 675
America
89204-643 Joinville - SC Brazil / BR
02 / CARDOSO, Marcio Evandro
Rua Irani 527
89211-610 Joinville - SC / BR
03 / MENDES, João Manoel
Rua Andorinha 836
89220-020 Joinville - SC / BR
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Soldatini, Andrea , et al
Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Corso dei Tintori, 25
50122 Firenze / IT
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date13853873.107.11.2013
WO2013BR00477
Priority number, dateBR2012102890012.11.2012         Original published format: BR102012028900
[2014/51]
Filing languagePT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014071487
Date:15.05.2014
Language:PT
[2014/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813799
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:BR15.05.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01B5/08, F25B41/00, G01B5/00, B07C5/07
[2015/24]
Former International [2014/51]G01B5/08, F25B41/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONTROLLE DER ABMESSUNGEN VON VERBINDUNGSROHREN[2014/51]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DIMENSIONAL CONTROL OF CONNECTOR TUBES[2014/51]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE DE DIMENSIONS POUR TUBES DE RACCORDEMENT[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase16.06.2014Translation filed 
16.06.2014National basic fee paid 
16.06.2014Search fee paid 
29.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
11.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/45]
02.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[I]US2007089314  (LISKOW KARL J [US]) [I] 1-3 * the whole document *
 [I]US1623352  (FOREST MADDEN HARRY DE ET AL) [I] 1-3 * the whole document *
 [I]US2525050  (SPICER CURTIS D ET AL) [I] 1-3 * the whole document *
 [A]US2003079359  ;
 [A]DE3816130  (ALTHAUS P GERHARD DR ING [DE]);
 [A]US4596076  (MESELTRON SA [CH])