Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2920668

EP2920668 - A MOBILE ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING AN ULTRATHIN SAPPHIRE COVER PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GTAT Corporation
243 Daniel Webster Highway
Merrimack, NH 03054 / US
[2015/39]
Inventor(s)01 / ZAHLER, James M.
6419 Barnaby Street NW
Washington, DC 20015 / US
02 / PETTI, Christopher, J.
660 Sierra Avenue
Mountain View, CA 94041 / US
 [2016/08]
Former [2015/41]01 / ZAHLER, James M.
4108 Jenifer Street NW
Washington, DC 20015 / US
02 / PETTI, Christopher, J.
660 Sierra Avenue
Mountain View, CA 94041 / US
Former [2015/39]01 / ZAHLER, James M.
161 Cross Street
Winchester, MA 01890 / US
02 / PETTI, Christopher, J.
660 Sierra Avenue
Mountain View, CA 94041 / US
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/39]Sticht, Andreas
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date13854302.014.11.2013
[2015/39]
WO2013US70079
Priority number, dateUS201261726227P14.11.2012         Original published format: US 201261726227 P
US201361808964P05.04.2013         Original published format: US 201361808964 P
US201361828067P28.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361828067 P
[2015/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014078524
Date:22.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2920668
Date:23.09.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2014
[2015/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.05.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/16
[2015/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/39]
TitleGerman:MOBILE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT ULTRADÜNNER SAPHIRABDECKPLATTE[2015/39]
English:A MOBILE ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING AN ULTRATHIN SAPPHIRE COVER PLATE[2015/39]
French:DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE MOBILE COMPRENANT UNE PLAQUE DE RECOUVREMENT DE SAPHIR ULTRA-MINCE[2015/39]
Entry into regional phase12.05.2015National basic fee paid 
12.05.2015Search fee paid 
12.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
12.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/39]
30.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.11.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.08.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]US6414781  (SAITOH HIROMI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-8,11 * column 15, line 56 - column 19, line 17; figures 10a,10b,11 * [I] 3,9,12
 [XI]US2008158173  (HAMBLIN MARK ARTHUR [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,11 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0039]; figures 2-4 * [I] 3-9,12
 [I]US2010014034  (MATSUHIRA TSUTOMU [JP]) [I] 1-9,11,12 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-2 *
 [I]WO2012092026  (TWIN CREEKS TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]; KELL ADAM [US]; CLARK-PHELPS ROBERT) [I] 10 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030] *
 [YA]US2010148293  (FAQUIR CHAND JAIN et al.) [Y] 1-13, 16-17, 19-22 , 24-25, 27-29, 37-43 * See paragraphs [0007], [0023], [0027], [0029]-[0030], [0039]; and figures 2(A), 3(B), 7. * [A] 14-15, 18, 23, 26 , 30-36
 [Y]US2009283211  (TSUTOMU MATSUHIRA) [Y] 1-13, 16-17, 19-22 , 24-25, 27-29, 37-43 * See paragraphs [0002], [0006], [0034], [0038]-[0039], [0046]-[0047]; and figures 1, 3-4. *
 [A]US2004007071  (TAKASHI MASUDA) [A] 1-43 * See paragraphs [0001], [0030], [0033], [0037], [0055]: and figures 1, 8. *
 [A]US2010026945  (KIM LEONG TAN et al.) [A] 1-43 * See paragraphs [0007]-[0008], [0044], [0046]; and figure 1A. *
 [A]JP2011510904  (CORNING INC) [A] 1-43 * See paragraphs [0002]-[0003], [0005]; and figure 1. *