Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2920962

EP2920962 - CONTENT ADAPTIVE TRANSFORM CODING FOR NEXT GENERATION VIDEO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.05.2019
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2015/39]
Inventor(s)01 / PURI, Atul
16080 NE 85th Street, Apt N204
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
02 / GOKHALE, Neelesh
1825 10th Ave W, Apt C
Seattle, WA 98119 / US
[N/P]
Former [2015/39]01 / PURI, Atul
16080 NE 85th Street, Apt N204
Redmond, Washington 98052 / US
02 / GOKHALE, Neelesh
1825 10th Ave W, Apt C
Seattle, Washington 98119 / US
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/39]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13855401.929.10.2013
[2015/39]
WO2013US67182
Priority number, dateUS201261725576P13.11.2012         Original published format: US 201261725576 P
US201361758314P30.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361758314 P
[2015/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014078068
Date:22.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2920962
Date:23.09.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2014
[2015/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.05.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04N19/119, H04N19/147, H04N19/46, H04N19/122, H04N19/12, H04N19/136, H04N19/82, H04N19/85, H04N19/573, H04N19/105
[2019/23]
Former International [2016/29]H04N19/00, H04N19/12
Former International [2015/39]H04N19/00, H04N7/64
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/39]
TitleGerman:INHALTSADAPTIVE TRANSFORMATIONSKODIERUNG FÜR VIDEOS DER NÄCHSTEN GENERATION[2019/26]
English:CONTENT ADAPTIVE TRANSFORM CODING FOR NEXT GENERATION VIDEO[2015/39]
French:CODAGE PAR TRANSFORMATION ADAPTATIVE DE CONTENU POUR UNE VIDÉO DE PROCHAINE GÉNÉRATION[2015/39]
Former [2015/39]INHALTSADAPTIVE TRANSFORMATIONSCODIERUNG FÜR VIDEOS DER NÄCHSTEN GENERATION
Entry into regional phase09.04.2015National basic fee paid 
09.04.2015Search fee paid 
09.04.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
09.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/39]
14.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.11.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2012281928  (COHEN ROBERT A [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0014]; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2009021062  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP], et al) [A] 3,4 * page 11 *;
 [A]US2012257677  (BANKOSKI JAMES [US], et al) [A] 9 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0043]; claim 6 *
 [Y]  - MINASYAN S ET AL, "An Image Compression Scheme Based on Parametric Haar-like Transform", CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS / IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS (ISCAS) : MAY 23 - 26, 2005, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE CENTER, KOBE, JAPAN, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (20050523), doi:10.1109/ISCAS.2005.1465030, ISBN 978-0-7803-8834-5, pages 2088 - 2091, XP010815995 [Y] 1-15 * page 2089, paragraph III - page 2090 * * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.2005.1465030
International search[A]US2007291849  (LAINEMA JANI [US]) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0015], [0022], [0025], [0032]; claims 3-4; and figure 8. *;
 [A]US5675386  (LEE SHI-HWA [KR], et al) [A] 1-25 * See abstract; column 1, lines 44-46; claim 1; and figure 3. *;
 [A]US2010002775  (HUANG SHIH-CHIA [TW], et al) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0045]-[0048]; claims 1, 6: and figures 1-8. *;
 [A]US2009279615  (AU OSCAR CHI LIM [CN], et al) [A] 1-25 * See abstract; paragraphs [0022], [0029]-[0030]; and claims 1-4, 14, 20. *;
 [A]US2012155532  (PURI ATUL [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0050]-[0054]; claims 5, 18; and figure 1. *