Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2924588

EP2924588 - REPORT CREATION METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.07.2019
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 21.08.2019  [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2019/34]
Former [2015/40]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Chun
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / ZHAO, Liyang
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2015/40]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2015/40]
Application number, filing date13857146.828.10.2013
[2015/40]
WO2013CN86062
Priority number, dateCN20121048531126.11.2012         Original published format: CN201210485311
[2015/40]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014079304
Date:30.05.2014
Language:ZH
[2014/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2924588
Date:30.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/40]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2924588
Date:21.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN30.05.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F16/21, G06F16/242, G06F16/28, G06F16/9038, G06F16/248
[2019/19]
Former International [2015/40]G06F17/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BERICHTERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM[2015/40]
English:REPORT CREATION METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM[2015/40]
French:PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE CRÉATION DE RAPPORT[2015/40]
Entry into regional phase27.05.2015Translation filed 
22.06.2015National basic fee paid 
22.06.2015Search fee paid 
22.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
22.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/40]
05.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.07.2019Fee for grant paid
08.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.05.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]US7840600  (BHATIA SANJAY [US]) [I] 1-21 * column 9, line 13 - column 9, line 34 * * column 11, line 41 - column 11, line 45 * * figures 2-12,20 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]US2005034064  (MEYERS AARON STEPHEN [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0013] * * figure 14 * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051] *;
 [A]US2009222476  (WILLIAMSON ERIC J [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *
International search[X]CN101770449  (BEIJING TOPSEC NETWORK SECURIT);
 [XP]CN103020158  (ZTE CORP);
 [A]CN102722533  (ZHEJIANG TUXUN TECHNOLOGY CO LTD)
 [Y]  - ZHANG, JIAN., "Design and implementation of WEB report tool based on BI", CHINA MASTER'S THESES FULL-TEXT DATABASE, (201203), pages 1139 - 431, XP055201590
 [Y]  - CUI, YONGSHENG ET AL., "A Graphical Design and Implementation of Report Tool", INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY AND INFORMATIZATION, (201204), pages 65 - 68, XP008176972

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3969/j.issn.1672-9528.2012.04.19