Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2925777

EP2925777 - MONOLITH-BASED PSEUDO-BIOAFFINITY PURIFICATION METHODS FOR FACTOR VIII AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.03.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CZ, DK
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Centre for Bioseparation Technology-VIT
VIT University
Vellore
Tamil Nadu 632014 / IN
[2015/41]
Inventor(s)01 / JANAKIRAMAN, Vignesh, Narasimhan
616 Technology Tower
VIT University
Vellore
Tamil Nadu 632 014 / IN
02 / PRASANNA, Rajasekar, Rajagopal
616 Technology Tower
VIT University
Vellore
Tamil Nadu 632 014 / IN
03 / KAMALANATHAN, Agamudi, Sivasankaran
616 Technology Tower
VIT University
Vellore
Tamil Nadu 632 014 / IN
04 / VIJAYALAKSHMI, Mookambeswaran, Arunachalam
616 Technology Tower
VIT University
Vellore
Tamil Nadu 632 014 / IN
 [2015/41]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2019/18]
Former [2015/41]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13857951.127.11.2013
[2015/41]
WO2013IB60438
Priority number, dateIN2012CHE501830.11.2012         Original published format: IN 5018CH2012
[2017/16]
Former [2015/41]IN2012CHE501830.11.2012
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014083510
Date:05.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2925777
Date:07.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2014
[2015/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2925777
Date:01.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.06.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/745
[2015/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/41]
Extension statesBA24.06.2015
ME24.06.2015
TitleGerman:AUF MONOLITH BASIERENDE PSEUDO-BIOAFFINITÄTSREINIGUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR FAKTOR VIII UND ANWENDUNGEN DAVON[2015/41]
English:MONOLITH-BASED PSEUDO-BIOAFFINITY PURIFICATION METHODS FOR FACTOR VIII AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF[2015/41]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE PURIFICATION PAR PSEUDO-BIOAFFINITÉ À BASE DE MONOLITHE POUR LE FACTEUR VIII ET LEURS APPLICATIONS[2015/41]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2015National basic fee paid 
24.06.2015Search fee paid 
24.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.09.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/41]
02.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2019Fee for grant paid
14.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
20.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL01.05.2019
CZ01.05.2019
DK01.05.2019
ES01.05.2019
FI01.05.2019
HR01.05.2019
LT01.05.2019
LV01.05.2019
NL01.05.2019
RS01.05.2019
SE01.05.2019
BG01.08.2019
NO01.08.2019
GR02.08.2019
IS01.09.2019
PT01.09.2019
[2020/09]
Former [2020/04]AL01.05.2019
ES01.05.2019
FI01.05.2019
HR01.05.2019
LT01.05.2019
LV01.05.2019
NL01.05.2019
RS01.05.2019
SE01.05.2019
BG01.08.2019
NO01.08.2019
GR02.08.2019
IS01.09.2019
PT01.09.2019
Former [2019/51]AL01.05.2019
ES01.05.2019
FI01.05.2019
HR01.05.2019
LT01.05.2019
LV01.05.2019
NL01.05.2019
RS01.05.2019
SE01.05.2019
BG01.08.2019
NO01.08.2019
GR02.08.2019
PT01.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL01.05.2019
ES01.05.2019
FI01.05.2019
HR01.05.2019
LT01.05.2019
LV01.05.2019
NL01.05.2019
RS01.05.2019
SE01.05.2019
NO01.08.2019
GR02.08.2019
PT01.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL01.05.2019
ES01.05.2019
FI01.05.2019
HR01.05.2019
LT01.05.2019
NL01.05.2019
SE01.05.2019
NO01.08.2019
PT01.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES01.05.2019
FI01.05.2019
LT01.05.2019
SE01.05.2019
NO01.08.2019
PT01.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES01.05.2019
FI01.05.2019
LT01.05.2019
NO01.08.2019
Documents cited:Search[E]WO2014041483  (CT FOR BIOSEPARATION TECHNOLOGY VIT [IN], et al) [E] 1-6,15 * example 4 *;
 [E]WO2014041500  (CT FOR BIOSEPARATION TECHNOLOGY VIT [IN], et al) [E] 1-7,15 * example 5 *;
 [XI]  - JEANNE M. LUSHER ET AL, "Evolution of recombinant factor VIII safety: KOGENATE and Kogenate FS/Bayer", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HEMATOLOGY., NL, (20091101), vol. 90, no. 4, doi:10.1007/s12185-009-0435-x, ISSN 0925-5710, pages 446 - 454, XP055262618 [X] 1,3-6,15 * page 447, column r, paragraph 2 * * figure 1; table 1 * [I] 7-14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12185-009-0435-x
 [XI]  - MANTOVAARA T ET AL, "PURIFICATION OF FACTOR VIII C COAGULANT ACTIVITY FROM RAT LIVER NONPARENCHYMAL CELL CULTURE MEDIUM BY IMMOBILIZED METAL ION AFFINITY CHROMATOGRAPHY", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 13, no. 1, ISSN 0885-4513, pages 120 - 126, XP009189336 [X] 1,3,5,6,15 * page 121, paragraph l - page 122, paragraph 1 * * page 122, paragraph l * [I] 7-14
 [XP]  - SUDHEER REDDY A.R. ET AL, "Expression, Purification, and Partial In Vitro Characterization of Biologically Active Human Coagulation Factor VIII Light Chain (A3-C1-C2) in Pichia pastoris", APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, United States, (20130630), vol. 171, no. 1, doi:10.1007/s12010-013-0338-4, ISSN 0273-2289, pages 10 - 19, XP055247043 [XP] 1-15 * page 13, paragraph 3 * * page 15, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12010-013-0338-4
International search[Y]US6831159  (MITTERER ET AL)
 [Y]WO0055185  (JIANG ET AL)
 [Y]WO03044043  (HAJ-AHMAD)
 [X]  - AMATSCHEK ET AL., "Affinity Chromatography of Human Blood Coagulation Factor V lll on Monoliths'with Peptides from a Combinatorial Library", JOURNAL OF HIGH RESOLUTION CHROMATOGRAPHY., (200001), vol. 23, no. ISSUE, pages 47 - 58, XP002513131

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-4168(20000101)23:1<47::AID-JHRC47>3.0.CO;2-P
 [A]  - KELLEY ET AL., "Development and Validation of an Affinity Chromatography Step Using a Peptide Ligand for cGMP Production of Factor VIII.", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING., (20040805), vol. 87, pages 400 - 412, XP002424716

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.20124
Examination   - JOSIC D ET AL, "Monoliths as stationary phases for separation of proteins and polynucleotides and enzymatic conversion", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B: BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES & APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010310), vol. 752, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0378-4347(00)00499-0, ISSN 1570-0232, pages 191 - 205, XP004317155

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4347(00)00499-0
    - VIJAYALAKSHMI MOOKAMBESWARAN A, "Histidine ligand affinity chromatography", MOLECULAR BIOTECHNOLOGY, HUMANA PRESS, INC, US, (19960101), vol. 6, no. 3, doi:10.1007/BF02761713, ISSN 1073-6085, pages 347 - 357, XP009501297

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02761713