Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2925377

EP2925377 - ABSORBANT AND REFLECTING BIOCOMPATIBLE DYES FOR HIGHLY ACCURATE MEDICAL IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.06.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2019New entry: Payment of fee for grant 
19.10.2019New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dean, David H.
19801 Malverne Road
Shaker Heights, OH 44122 / US
For all designated states
Siblani, Al
214 Beech Daily
Dearborn Heights, MI 48127 / US
For all designated states
Mott, Eric J.
10026 Taplin Ln.
Plainwell, MI 49080 / US
For all designated states
Fisher, John P.
10008 Connecticut Avenue
Kensington, MD 20895 / US
For all designated states
Wang, Martha O
6632 Waning Moon Way
Columbia, MO 21045 / US
For all designated states
Mikos, Antonios G.
2329 Wroxton Road
Houston, TX 77005 / US
[2015/41]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2015/41]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/41]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13859090.602.12.2013
[2015/41]
WO2013US72623
Priority number, dateUS201261731843P30.11.2012         Original published format: US 201261731843 P
US20131381761226.07.2013         Original published format: US201313817612
[2015/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014085809
Date:05.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2925377
Date:07.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2014
[2015/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.06.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61L27/58, A61L27/14, A61L27/50
[2016/40]
Former International [2015/41]A61L27/58
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/41]
TitleGerman:SAUGFÄHIGE UND BIOKOMPATIBLE REFLEKTIERENDE FARBSTOFFE FÜR HOCHGENAUE MEDIZINISCHE IMPLANTATE[2015/41]
English:ABSORBANT AND REFLECTING BIOCOMPATIBLE DYES FOR HIGHLY ACCURATE MEDICAL IMPLANTS[2015/41]
French:COLORANTS BIOCOMPATIBLES ABSORBANTS ET RÉFLÉCHISSANTS POUR IMPLANTS MÉDICAUX EXTRÊMEMENT PRÉCIS[2015/41]
Entry into regional phase22.06.2015National basic fee paid 
22.06.2015Search fee paid 
22.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
22.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/41]
03.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2019Fee for grant paid
17.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.08.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
20.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201503   M06   Fee paid on   15.06.2016
31.12.201604   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2017
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2012024675  (UNIV CASE WESTERN RESERVE [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0076]; claims 1-20 *;
 [A]EP1852134  (ALCARE CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0057]; claims 1-4 *
International search[X]WO2012024675  (UNIV CASE WESTERN RESERVE [US], et al);
 [Y]US2006039939  (LAI JOHN T [US], et al);
 [Y]US2007154558  (GASEROD OLAV [NO], et al);
 [Y]US2005239971  (HUSLER RINALDO [CH], et al)