Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2929750

EP2929750 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SETTING UP COMMUNICATION LINK IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  13.09.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2015/42]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Jong-Hyo
304-1603 Mujigaemaeul Sinhan APT.
63 Migeum-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-708 / KR
02 / LEE, Ji-Hye
108-502 Yeoksam e-Pyeonhansesang APT.
20 Seolleung-ro 69-gil
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 135-926 / KR
03 / HAN, Se-Hee
317-2303 Jamsil Siyeong Parkrio APT.
435 Olympic-ro
Songpa-gu
Seoul 138-930 / KR
04 / KANG, Jae-Eun
203-1402 Suwon Gwonseon SKVIEW APT.
25 Gwonseon-ro 694beon-gil
Gwonseon-gu
Suwon-si 441-737 / KR
05 / YANG, Chil-Youl
101-1301 Seoul National University I-won APT.
78 Cheongnyong-gil
Gwanak-gu
Seoul 151-050 / KR
06 / LEE, Myoung-Hwan
108-701 Dongsuwon LG Village APT.
32 Taejang-ro 82beon-gil
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-706 / KR
07 / LEE, Chun-Ho
102-1704 Castle Tower APT.
184 Gwongwang-ro
Paldal-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-835 / KR
08 / LEE, Tae-Young
203
87 Doksan-ro 108-gil
Geumcheon-gu
Seoul 153-820 / KR
 [2015/42]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/42]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date13859701.804.12.2013
[2015/42]
WO2013KR11151
Priority number, dateKR2012013992504.12.2012         Original published format: KR 20120139925
[2015/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014088308
Date:12.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2929750
Date:14.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014
[2015/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR12.06.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W76/02, H04W8/26, H04B5/00, H04L29/12
[2016/29]
Former International [2015/42]H04W76/02, H04W8/26, H04B5/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/42]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBAU EINER KOMMUNIKATIONSVERBINDUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2015/42]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SETTING UP COMMUNICATION LINK IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2015/42]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTABLISSEMENT DE LIAISON DE COMMUNICATION DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2015/42]
Entry into regional phase01.07.2015National basic fee paid 
01.07.2015Search fee paid 
01.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/42]
26.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.09.2019
29.05.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/42]
08.06.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/42]
23.09.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.05.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2012111999  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [I] 1,9 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0023] - [0030] - [0035] , [0036] , [0038] , [0040] *;
 [A]US2003179750  (HASTY WILLIAM V [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0005] , [0008] , [0009] , [0012] - [0014] - [0032] , [0045] , [0048] , [0050] *
 [I]  - "Wi-Fi Peer-to-Peer (P2P) Technical Specification v1.2", vol. V1.2, (20111214), pages 1 - 159, WI-FI PEER-TO-PEER (P2P) SPECIFICATION V1.2, WI-FI ALLIANCE, US, URL: https://www.wi-fi.org/knowledge-center/published-specifications, XP008165048 [I] 1-16 * paragraphs [3.1.4.2] - [3.1.4.2.3] - [3.2.6] *
International search[Y]US2012233266  (HASSAN AMER A [US], et al);
 [Y]WO2011153269  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al);
 [A]US2008212504  (VENKATARAMAN MUKUNDAN [IN], et al);
 [A]US2010070758  (LOW DARYL MUN-KID [US], et al);
 [A]EP2519071  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR])
by applicant   - WI-FI PEER-TO-PEER (P2P) TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION VERSION 1.2, (201112), pages 1 - 159