Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2931008

EP2931008 - PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.11.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TYCO ELECTRONICS AMP KOREA Co., Ltd.
68, Gongdan 1-ro
Jillyang-eup
Gyeongsan-si
Gyeongsangbuk-do, 38459 / KR
[2017/26]
Former [2015/42]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics AMP Korea Ltd.
68, Gongdan 1-ro
Jinryang-eup
Gyeongsan-si
Gyeongsangbuk-do 712-837 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / CHOI, Yang Yoon
c/o Tyco Electronics AMP Korea Ltd
68 Gongdan 1-ro
Jilyang-eup
Gyeongsan-si
Gyeongsangbuk-do 712-837 / KR
02 / BEAK, Ok Ky
521, 3-Ia, Sihwa Industrial Complex
1383-4, Jeongwang-Dong
Shiheung-si Gyeonggi-do 429-854 / KR
 [2016/01]
Former [2015/42]01 / CHOI, Yang Yoon
c/o Tyco Electronics AMP Korea Ltd
68 Gongdan 1-ro
Jilyang-eup
Gyeongsan-si
Gyeongsangbuk-do 712-837 / KR
02 / BEAK, Ok Ky
c/o Tae Woo E&P Co. Ltd
No 521 3-la, Schwagondan, 112
118 Bungil
Mayu-ro
Siheung-si Gyeonggi-do 429-854 / KR
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/42]Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
Application number, filing date13861374.006.12.2013
[2015/42]
WO2013KR11247
Priority number, dateKR2012014157607.12.2012         Original published format: KR 20120141576
[2015/42]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014088357
Date:12.06.2014
Language:KO
[2014/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2931008
Date:14.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR12.06.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:H05K1/09, H05K3/46, H05K7/20
[2015/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/42]
TitleGerman:LEITERPLATTE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2015/42]
English:PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR[2015/42]
French:CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CETTE DERNIÈRE[2015/42]
Entry into regional phase29.06.2015Translation filed 
29.06.2015National basic fee paid 
29.06.2015Search fee paid 
29.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
29.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/42]
02.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.11.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH08264952  (SHARP KK) [Y] 1-24 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0012]; figures 6, 7 *;
 [Y]US2005178669  (STRUBBE JOHN L [US]) [Y] 1-24 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US2002127379  (SUZUKI TAKESHI [JP], et al);
 [Y]KR20090053628  (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]);
 [A]KR20110067921  (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]);
 [A]US2012111622  (DAIGAKU NORITSUGU [JP], et al);
 [A]US2005178669  (STRUBBE JOHN L [US])
by applicantKR100674321B
 JP2004179291