Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2932857

EP2932857 - PET FOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.10.2018  [2018/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Shimobun
Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime 799-0111 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2015/43]For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Shimobun
Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi, Ehime 799-0111 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / IKEZAKI, Yuma
c/o Food Development Department
Unicharm Petcare Company
Unicharm Corporation
9-67 Kita-Itami
Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0831 / JP
02 / SAKODA, Junya
c/o Food Development Department
Unicharm Petcare Company
Unicharm Corporation
9-67 Kita-Itami
Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0831 / JP
 [2015/43]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/43]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date13861639.612.12.2013
[2015/43]
WO2013JP83364
Priority number, dateJP2012027289313.12.2012         Original published format: JP 2012272893
[2015/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014092158
Date:19.06.2014
Language:JA
[2014/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2932857
Date:21.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP19.06.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:A23K50/48, A23K10/20, A23K10/30, A23K20/142, A23K20/22, A23K20/24, A23K20/26
[2016/28]
Former International [2015/43]A23K1/18, A23K1/10, A23K1/14, A23K1/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/43]
TitleGerman:HAUSTIERFUTTER[2015/43]
English:PET FOOD[2015/43]
French:ALIMENT POUR ANIMAUX DE COMPAGNIE[2015/43]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2015Translation filed 
22.05.2015National basic fee paid 
22.05.2015Search fee paid 
22.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/43]
30.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2018Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
01.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/40]
30.05.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/40]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.08.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]GB1398561  (SANDOZ LTD) [X] 1,6,7 * examples 8-10 * * the whole document *
 [I]NL2004749C  (OFFENBERG AUGUSTINUS THEODORUS ANTONIUS [NL]) [I] 1-7 * the whole document *
 [X]  - Stephanie Wick Sedgwick, "Chicken Tenderloin, Butternut Squash and Chickpea Stew", (20110126), The Washinton Post, URL: https://www.washingtonpost.com/pb/recipes/chicken-tenderloin-butternut-squash-and-chickpea-stew/11878/, (20160608), XP002758528 [X] 1,2,6,7 * the whole document *
 [X]  - Ethan Stowell, "Chicken Hot Pot with Mushrooms and Tofu", (200810), Foodandwine.com, URL: http://www.foodandwine.com/recipes/chicken-hot-pot-with-mushrooms-and-tofu/print, (20160608), XP002758529 [X] 1,6,7 * the whole document *
 [I]  - LEWIS LD ET AL, "Diet as a causative factor of feline urolithiasis", VETERINARY CLINICS OF NORTH AMERICA: SMALL ANIMAL PRACTICE, SAUNDERS, PHILADELPHIA, US, (19840501), vol. 14, no. 3, ISSN 0195-5616, pages 513 - 527, XP009115165 [I] 1-7 * the whole document *
 [I]  - LEKCHAROENSUK CHALERMPOL ET AL, "ASSOCIATIONS BETWEEN DIETARY FACTORS IN CANNED FOOD AND FORMATION OF CALCIUM OXALATE UROLITHS IN DOGS", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF VETERINARY RESEARCH, AMERICAN VETERINARY MEDICINE ASSOCIATION, US, (20020201), vol. 63, no. 2, doi:10.2460/AJVR.2002.63.163, ISSN 0002-9645, pages 163 - 169, XP009081113 [I] 1-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2460/ajvr.2002.63.163
 JP2003518938  [ ]
 [Y]JP2009523827  (HILL'S PET NUTRITION, INC.)
 [Y]US2008233244  (KRISTEN J.SWENSON)
 [Y]JP2011510621  (SPECIALITES PET FOOD)
 [Y]JP2009207487  (KABUSHIKI KAISHA GREAT)
 [A]JP2004523226  (HILL'S PET NUTRITION, INC.)
 [A]JP2007514412  (HILL'S PET NUTRITION, INC.)
 [A]JPH06298641  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.)
 [A]JPH078182  (NOSAN CORP.)