Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2930080

EP2930080 - TORQUE DISTRIBUTION METHOD FOR ENGINE AND MOTOR OF ENERGY-EFFICIENT HYBRID ELECTRIC VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
15.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Saic Motor Corporation Limited
Flat 509
Building No.1 Songtao Road No.563
Zhangjiang High-Tech Park
Shanghai 201203 / CN
[2015/42]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHOU, Yuxing
Room 509
Building No.1
Songtao Road
No.563, Zhangjiang Hi-TechPark
Shanghai 201203 / CN
02 / ZHU, Jun
Room 509
Building No.1
Songtao Road
No.563, Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park
Shanghai 201203 / CN
03 / DENG, Xiaoguang
Room 509
Building No.1
Songtao Road
No.563, Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park
Shanghai 201203 / CN
04 / ZHANG, Feifei
Room 509
Building No.1
Songtao Road
No.563, Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park
Shanghai 201203 / CN
05 / ZHAO, Yi
Room 509
Building No.1
Songtao Road
No.563, Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park
Shanghai 201203 / CN
 [2015/42]
Representative(s)Sharman, Thomas Alexander
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/42]Sharman, Thomas Alexander
Reddie & Grose LLP
16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date13862482.003.12.2013
[2015/42]
WO2013CN88427
Priority number, dateCN20121052679710.12.2012         Original published format: CN201210526797
[2015/42]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014090101
Date:19.06.2014
Language:ZH
[2014/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2930080
Date:14.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN19.06.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:B60W20/00, B60W10/06, B60W10/08, B60W20/10, B60K6/48
[2016/19]
Former International [2015/42]B60W20/00, B60W10/06, B60W10/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/42]
TitleGerman:DREHMOMENTVERTEILUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DIE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE UND DEN MOTOR EINES ENERGIEEFFIZIENTEN ELEKTRISCHEN HYBRIDFAHRZEUGS[2015/42]
English:TORQUE DISTRIBUTION METHOD FOR ENGINE AND MOTOR OF ENERGY-EFFICIENT HYBRID ELECTRIC VEHICLE[2015/42]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DISTRIBUTION DE COUPLE POUR MOTEUR ET MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE DE VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE HYBRIDE ÉCOÉNERGÉTIQUE[2015/42]
Entry into regional phase12.06.2015Translation filed 
12.06.2015National basic fee paid 
12.06.2015Search fee paid 
12.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
12.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/42]
03.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2018Date of oral proceedings
27.06.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
06.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination06.09.2018Appeal received No.  T2922/18
07.11.2018Statement of grounds filed
25.08.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.04.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
14.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[IY]US2012116626  (PERKINS WILLIAM PAUL [US] ET AL) [I] 1-9 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 1-9
 [Y]US2004060751  (FRANK ANDREW A [US]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1,2 *
 [A]EP2476595  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1,4,5 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] *
 [A]AT9756U  (MAGNA STEYR FAHRZEUGTECHNIK AG [AT]) [A] 1,6,7,9 * page 6, line 43 - page 7, line 4; figure 4 *
 [A]US5842534  (FRANK ANDREW A [US]) [A] 1,8 * column 8, line 4 - line 11; figure 4 *
 [X]CN102431550  (DALIAN UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY)
 [A]CN102774374  (SAIC MOTOR CORPORATION LIMITED)
 [A]CN101602362  (CHERY AUTOMOBILE CO., LTD)
 [A]CN102358283  (CHERY AUTOMOBILE CO., LTD)
 [A]JP2012086709  (NISSAN MOTOR)
 [A]JP2011063089  (MITSUBISHI FUSO TRUCK & BUS)