Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2923447

EP2923447 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPEN-LOOP MIMO COMMUNICATIONS IN A SCMA COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/35]
Former [2017/02]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Former [2015/40]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / BAYESTEH, Alireza
66 Sundback Ln.
Ottawa, Ontario K2L 2W8 / CA
02 / NIKOPOUR, Hosein
236 Kohilo Cres.
Ottawa, Ontario K2S 0E6 / CA
03 / MA, Jianglei
3 Bon Echo Cres.
Ottawa, Ontario K2M 2W5 / CA
 [2015/40]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[2015/40]
Application number, filing date13863210.413.12.2013
[2015/40]
WO2013CN89397
Priority number, dateUS201261737338P14.12.2012         Original published format: US 201261737338 P
US20131403599625.09.2013         Original published format: US201314035996
[2015/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014090189
Date:19.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2923447
Date:30.09.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014
[2015/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2923447
Date:28.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN19.06.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/04, H04B7/02, H04B7/06, H04L25/03
[2015/51]
Former International [2015/40]H04B1/69, H04B7/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR OPEN-LOOP-MIMO-KOMMUNIKATIONEN IN EINEM SCMA-KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2015/40]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPEN-LOOP MIMO COMMUNICATIONS IN A SCMA COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM[2015/40]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATIONS MIMO EN BOUCLE OUVERTE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATIONS SCMA[2015/40]
Entry into regional phase23.06.2015National basic fee paid 
23.06.2015Search fee paid 
23.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/40]
06.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2019Fee for grant paid
26.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.12.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
18.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XYI]  - CHEN H ET AL, "A multi-code space-frequency RAKE receiver", SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS, 2004. CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE THIRTY- EIGHTH ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON PACIFIC GROVE, CA, USA NOV. 7-10, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041107), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/ACSSC.2004.1399219, ISBN 978-0-7803-8622-8, pages 672 - 676, XP010779636 [X] 1,4,6,8,9,18 * page 672 - page 673; figures 1,3 * [Y] 2,10 [I] 3,5,7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.2004.1399219
 [Y]  - MOHAMMED AL-IMARI ET AL, "Performance evaluation of Low Density Spreading Multiple Access", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND MOBILE COMPUTING CONFERENCE (IWCMC), 2012 8TH INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, (20120827), doi:10.1109/IWCMC.2012.6314235, ISBN 978-1-4577-1378-1, pages 383 - 388, XP032253331 [Y] 2 * page 384; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IWCMC.2012.6314235
 [Y]  - SALZER T ET AL, "Comparison of antenna array techniques for the downlink of multi-carrier CDMA systems", VTC 2003-SPRING. THE 57TH. IEEE SEMIANNUAL VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. PROCEEDINGS. JEJU, KOREA, APRIL 22 - 25, 2003; [IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030422), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/VETECS.2003.1207554, ISBN 978-0-7803-7757-8, pages 316 - 320, XP010862141 [Y] 10 * Section III and III.B; page 317 - page 318; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECS.2003.1207554
International search[X]CN101009534  (ZTE CORP [CN]);
 [Y]CN101483449  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]);
 [X]CN1455524  (UNIV XINAN JIAOTONG [CN]);
 [A]US6952439  (LINDSEY WILLIAM C [US], et al)
by applicant   - "A multi-code space-frequency RAKE receiver", DOCUMENT CHEN H et al., SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS, 2004. CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE THIRTY-EIGHTH ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON PACIFIC GROVE, IEEE, (20041107), vol. 1, pages 672 - 676
    - "Performance evaluation of Low Density Spreading Multiple Access", MOHAMMED AL-IMARI et al., WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND MOBILE COMPUTING CONFERENCE (IWCMC), 2012 8TH INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, (20120827), pages 383 - 388
    - "Comparison of antenna array techniques for the downlink of multi-carrier CDMA systems", SALZER et al., VTC 2003-SPRING. THE 57TH. IEEE SEMIANNUAL VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. PROCEEDINGS. JEJU, KOREA, APRIL 22-25, 2003; [IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, IEEE, (20030422), vol. 1, pages 316 - 320