Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2929450

EP2929450 - AUTOMATED DELIVERY OF MULTIMEDIA CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.12.2018  [2018/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Foneclay, Inc.
P.O. Box 7031
Rancho Santa Fe, California 92067 / US
[2015/42]
Inventor(s)01 / ETEMINAN, Isaac
5350 Avenida Maravillas
PO Box 7031
Ranch Santa Fe, CA 92067 / US
02 / DRESDEN, Scott
6119 Calle Camposeco
Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 / US
03 / BISHOP, James
3876 Clovergate Dr
Colorado Springs, CO 80920 / US
 [2015/42]
Representative(s)Stuttard, Garry Philip
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/42]Stuttard, Garry Philip
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Tower North Central
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date13863228.604.12.2013
[2015/42]
WO2013US73202
Priority number, dateUS201261735159P10.12.2012         Original published format: US 201261735159 P
US20131385970709.04.2013         Original published format: US201313859707
[2015/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014093106
Date:19.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2929450
Date:14.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014
[2015/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.06.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/16, G06F1/10, G06F1/30, H04L29/06, H04L29/08
[2016/27]
Former International [2015/42]G06F15/16, G06F1/10, G06F1/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/42]
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISIERTE BEREITSTELLUNG VON MULTIMEDIA-INHALTEN[2015/42]
English:AUTOMATED DELIVERY OF MULTIMEDIA CONTENT[2015/42]
French:FOURNITURE AUTOMATIQUE DE CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA[2015/42]
Entry into regional phase21.04.2015National basic fee paid 
21.04.2015Search fee paid 
21.04.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
21.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/42]
13.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/49]
30.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US2002087656  (GARGIULO MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0032]; figure 5 *;
 [X]US2004043770  (AMIT ASSAF [IL], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0215]; figures 1-8 *
International searchUS2002087656  [ ]
 US2004043770  [ ]
 [X]US2004043770  (AMIT, A ET AL.)
 [X]US2011161912  (ETEMINAN, I ET AL.)
 [A]US2012254358  (WEI, B ET AL.)
 [A]US2007011182  (CHIU, F).)
 [A]US2002087656  (GARGIULO, M ET AL.)