Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2932795

EP2932795 - THREE DIMENSIONAL INDUCTION RETHERMALIZING STATIONS AND CONTROL SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Vollrath Company, LLC
1236 North 18th Street P.O. Box 611
Sheboygan, WI 53082-0611 / US
[2015/43]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Yang
1961 Blackhawk Drive
Grafton, Wisconsin 53024 / US
02 / ROEVER, Peter
7864 Noah Lane
West Bend, Wisconsin 53090 / US
03 / WOJCIK, John
6031 Cart Path Road
Sheboygan, Wisconsin 53081 / US
 [2015/43]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2017/16]
Former [2015/43]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13863536.211.12.2013
[2015/43]
WO2013US74368
Priority number, dateUS20121371279212.12.2012         Original published format: US201213712792
US201361818711P02.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361818711 P
[2015/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014093476
Date:19.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2932795
Date:21.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014
[2015/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2932795
Date:19.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR19.06.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:H05B6/12, H05B6/36, A47J27/00, A47J27/122, A47J39/00, A47J36/34, A47J36/24, A47J36/00, A47J27/14
[2016/08]
Former International [2015/43]H05B6/12, H05B6/36, A47J27/00, A47J27/122
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WIEDERERWÄRMUNGSSTATIONEN MIT DREIDIMENSIONALER INDUKTION UND STEUERUNGSSYSTEME[2015/43]
English:THREE DIMENSIONAL INDUCTION RETHERMALIZING STATIONS AND CONTROL SYSTEMS[2015/43]
French:STATIONS DE RETHERMALISATION PAR INDUCTION EN TROIS DIMENSIONS ET SYSTÈMES DE COMMANDE ASSOCIÉS[2015/43]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2015National basic fee paid 
03.07.2015Search fee paid 
03.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/43]
05.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2017Fee for grant paid
08.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17166801.5  / EP3214898
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.11.2016
Opposition(s)22.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201604   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2017
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.12.2013
AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
MC19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
IE11.12.2017
LU11.12.2017
MT11.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2019/30]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
MC19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
IE11.12.2017
LU11.12.2017
MT11.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/52]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
IE11.12.2017
LU11.12.2017
MT11.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/50]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
IE11.12.2017
LU11.12.2017
MT11.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
Former [2018/45]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
IE11.12.2017
LU11.12.2017
MT11.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
LU11.12.2017
MT11.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL19.04.2017
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2008047948  (ROSENBLOOM RICHARD H [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [Y] 2-15;
 [Y]EP0458977  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 2-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5201797  (WENG SHUN-TE [TW]) [Y] 2-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2011011850  (ROSENBLOOM RICHARD H [US], et al);
 [Y]US2008257166  (PENG ZHENG [US]);
 [Y]US2002125245  (FUCHS CHRISTIAN [CH]);
 [Y]US2011114618  (CHUNG TERRY TAE-IL [US], et al);
 [A]US2012152932  (MOON JUNG S [US], et al)