blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2932795


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
23.02.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
21.04.2017 Change - divisional application(s) published on  24.05.2017  [2017/21]
17.03.2017 (Expected) grant published on  19.04.2017  [2017/16]
11.03.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
11.03.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.03.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
01.03.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
01.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.02.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
21.11.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.10.2016 Change - classification published on  23.11.2016  [2016/47]
21.10.2016 Change - classification published on  23.11.2016  [2016/47]
09.08.2016 Amendment by applicant
19.02.2016 Change - extension states published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
26.01.2016 Supplementary search report published on  24.02.2016  [2016/08]
22.01.2016 Change - classification published on  24.02.2016  [2016/08]
22.01.2016 Change - classification published on  24.02.2016  [2016/08]
13.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.10.2015 Change - PCT data published on  11.11.2015  [2015/46]
06.10.2015 Change - representative
18.09.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  21.10.2015  [2015/43]
18.09.2015 Request for examination filed published on  21.10.2015  [2015/43]
10.09.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
19.08.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
07.07.2015 Amendment by applicant
03.07.2015 Change - representative
03.07.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
16.06.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
04.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication