blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2932795 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP13863536 EP17166801



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019216260Global Dossier 18.07.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201916365366 26.03.2019
US201615090950 05.04.2016
US201213712792 12.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015272385Global Dossier 01.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201514737190 11.06.2015
WO2013US74368 11.12.2013
US201213712792 12.12.2012
US201361818711 02.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10251511Global Dossier 09.04.2019B2
US2016213196 28.07.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201615090950 05.04.2016
US201213712792 12.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9307862Global Dossier 12.04.2016B2
US2014157998 12.06.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201213712792 12.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3214898Global Dossier 06.09.2017A1
Priority number Date
EP13863536 11.12.2013
US201213712792 12.12.2012
US201361818711 02.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2932795Global Dossier 19.04.2017B1
EP2932795 24.02.2016A4
EP2932795 21.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013US74368 11.12.2013
US201213712792 12.12.2012
US201361818711 02.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2625453T 19.07.2017T3
Priority number Date
WO2013US74368 11.12.2013
US201213712792 12.12.2012
US201361818711 02.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX359286 21.09.2018B
MX2015007417 03.12.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013US74368 11.12.2013
US201213712792 12.12.2012
US201361818711 02.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014093476Global Dossier 19.06.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201213712792 12.12.2012
US201361818711 02.05.2013
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3214898