Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2933150

EP2933150 - VEHICLE INFORMATION PROVISION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.09.2015
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Seiki Co., Ltd.
2-34 Higashi-Zaoh 2-chome
Nagaoka-shi, Niigata 940-8580 / JP
[2015/43]
Inventor(s)01 / TAMURA, Shigeaki
Nippon Seiki, Co., Ltd.
2-2-34 Higashi Zoah
Nagaoka
Niigata / JP
 [2015/43]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2015/43]
Application number, filing date13863641.008.11.2013
[2015/43]
WO2013JP80177
Priority number, dateJP2012027088112.12.2012         Original published format: JP 2012270881
JP2013001934704.02.2013         Original published format: JP 2013019347
[2015/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014091844
Date:19.06.2014
Language:JA
[2014/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2933150
Date:21.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP19.06.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:B60R16/02, B60R16/023
[2015/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/43]
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSBEREITSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG[2015/43]
English:VEHICLE INFORMATION PROVISION DEVICE[2015/43]
French:DISPOSITIF DE FOURNITURE D'INFORMATION DE VÉHICULE[2015/43]
Entry into regional phase10.06.2015Translation filed 
10.06.2015National basic fee paid 
10.06.2015Search fee paid 
10.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
10.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/43]
19.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP2011166290  (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1, 2 *;
 [Y]US2012050028  (MASTRONARDI JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,8 * figure 11 *;
 [A]JP2011193040  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0771686  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP2466262  (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC [JP]) [Y] 7 * figure 8 *
International search[Y]JP2011166290  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [Y]JP2011193040  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al);
 [Y]JPH09123848  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP);
 [Y]JP2012128620  (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC);
 [A]JP2009281991  (FUJITSU TEN LTD);
 [A]JP2008501574  (VOLKSWAGEN AG.);
 [A]WO2011049070  (CLARION CO LTD [JP], et al)
by applicantJP2003244343