Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2936722

EP2936722 - MODULATION METHOD AND APPARATUS WITH CONSIDERATION OF ADAPTIVE HYBRID AUTOMATIC REPEAT REQUEST IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.11.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2015/44]
Inventor(s)01 / SEOL, Ji-Yun
208-801
179 Buljeong-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-751 / KR
02 / KIM, Tae-Young
308-103
177 Migeum-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 436-739 / KR
03 / ROH, Won-Il
112-904
26 Sinbong 2-ro
Suji-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-533 / KR
04 / PARK, Jeong-Ho
1-707
200 Seochojungang-ro
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-779 / KR
05 / SAGONG, Min
307-1503
36 Dongtanwoncheon-ro 915beon-gil
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-794 / KR
06 / YU, Hyun-Kyu
2304-1201
23 Gwanggyohosu-ro 152beon-gil
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-280 / KR
07 / CHEUN, Kyung-Whoon
108-902
2803 Nambusunhwan-ro
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 135-537 / KR
08 / CHO, Jae-Weon
110-702
190 Bundang-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-748 / KR
09 / HONG, Sung-Nam
7-205
283 Dongan-ro
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-843 / KR
 [2015/44]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2018/09]
Former [2015/44]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date13865348.023.12.2013
[2015/44]
WO2013KR12029
Priority number, dateKR2012015090421.12.2012         Original published format: KR 20120150904
[2015/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014098541
Date:26.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2936722
Date:28.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014
[2015/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2936722
Date:28.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR26.06.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/18, H04L27/10, H04L27/34, H04L27/18, H04L27/26, H04L27/00, H04L27/36
[2016/31]
Former International [2015/44]H04L1/18, H04L27/10, H04L27/34
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MODULATIONSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG UNTER BERÜCKSICHTIGUNG VON ADAPTIVEM HARQ IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2015/44]
English:MODULATION METHOD AND APPARATUS WITH CONSIDERATION OF ADAPTIVE HYBRID AUTOMATIC REPEAT REQUEST IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2015/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE MODULATION EN RAPPORT AVEC UNE DEMANDE DE RÉPÉTITION AUTOMATIQUE HYBRIDE ADAPTATIVE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2015/44]
Entry into regional phase29.05.2015National basic fee paid 
29.05.2015Search fee paid 
29.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/44]
31.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
06.10.2017Fee for grant paid
06.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.06.2017
Opposition(s)29.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/13]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/36]CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
Documents cited:Search[XYI]  - JAMES SHE ET AL, "Layered Adaptive Modulation and Coding for 4G Wireless Networks", GLOBECOM 2010, 2010 IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20101206), ISBN 978-1-4244-5636-9, pages 1 - 6, XP031846194 [X] 1,3,7,11,13 * Sect.s II-A, II-B, III-B * * figures 1, 2 * [Y] 2 [I] 5,6,10,12,14
 [X]  - SUAYB S ARSLAN ET AL, "Coded Hierarchical Modulation for Wireless Progressive Image Transmission", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20111101), vol. 60, no. 9, doi:10.1109/TVT.2011.2163179, ISSN 0018-9545, pages 4299 - 4313, XP011388436 [X] 1,3,7,11,13 * Sect.s I-III * * figures 1, 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TVT.2011.2163179
 [YA]  - ASMA LATIF ET AL, "Performance of Hybrid MQAM-LFSK (HQFM) OFDM Transceiver in Rayleigh Fading Channels", MULTITOPIC CONFERENCE, 2006. INMIC '06. IEEE, IEEE, PI, (20061201), ISBN 978-1-4244-0794-1, pages 52 - 55, XP031085690 [Y] 2 * Sect.s I, II * * figures 1-3 * * table 1 * [A] 1,3,5-7,10-14
 [A]  - AMRICO M C CORREIA ET AL, "Multi-Resolution Broadcast/Multicast Systems for MBMS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BROADCASTING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20070301), vol. 53, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TBC.2007.891705, ISSN 0018-9316, pages 224 - 234, XP011172015 [A] 1-3,5-7,10-14 * Sect.s I-III * * figures 2, 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBC.2007.891705
 [A]  - Roberto Padovani ET AL, "Coded Phase/Frequency Modulation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, Vol. 34, Issue 5, (19860101), pages 446 - 453, URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/ielx5/26/24007/01096564.pdf?tp=&arnumber=1096564&isnumber=24007, (20160620), XP055281891 [A] 1-3,5-7,10-14 * Sect.s I, II * * figures 2-4 * * tables 2, 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOM.1986.1096564
International search[Y]US2009060094  (JUNG YOUNG-SEOK [KR], et al);
 [Y]WO2008133437  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al);
 [A]US2012155415  (SEOK YONG HO [KR]);
 [A]US2006115014  (JEONG SU-RYONG [KR], et al)
 [Y]  - ASMA LATIF ET AL., "Error rate performance of Hybrid QAM-FSK in OFDM systems exhibiting low PAPR", SCIENCE IN CHINA SERIES F: INFORMATION SCIENCES, (200910), vol. 52, no. 10, pages 1875 - 1880, XP055257266

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11432-009-0165-y