Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2922224

EP2922224 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETECTING FREQUENCY SPECTRUM INTERFERENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2017/44]
Former [2015/39]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / GUO, Xiaoyu
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / MU, Xuelu
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / YI, Dachuan
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
04 / ZHAO, Zhiyong
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
05 / CUI, Yijun
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
06 / YU, Xuede
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
07 / XIAO, Guangguo
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2015/39]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2015/39]
Application number, filing date13865370.409.09.2013
[2015/39]
WO2013CN83151
Priority number, dateCN20121054842818.12.2012         Original published format: CN201210548428
[2015/39]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014094460
Date:26.06.2014
Language:ZH
[2014/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2922224
Date:23.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2922224
Date:01.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN26.06.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/10, H04B17/345
[2015/49]
Former International [2015/39]H04B17/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/39]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON FREQUENZSPEKTRUMSINTERFERENZ[2015/39]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETECTING FREQUENCY SPECTRUM INTERFERENCE[2015/39]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'INTERFÉRENCES DANS UN SPECTRE DE FRÉQUENCES[2015/39]
Entry into regional phase18.06.2015Translation filed 
18.06.2015National basic fee paid 
18.06.2015Search fee paid 
18.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/39]
04.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2017Fee for grant paid
10.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.06.2017
Opposition(s)02.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2018/52]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/40]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/37]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/35]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/24]AT01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/22]ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
NO01.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2408117  (ST ERICSSON SA [CH]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraphs [0015] , [0 18] , [0 19] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1, 4, 5, 10 * * paragraph [0042] *;
 [A]US6304594  (SALINGER SHELDON NORMAN [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 4, line 56 - column 7, line 17; figure 2 *
International search[A]CN101453228  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]);
 [A]CN101986573  (ZTE CORP);
 [A]CN102186202  (COMBA TELECOM SYS CHINA CO LTD);
 [A]EP1551199  (NOKIA CORP [FI])