Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2935718

EP2935718 - MICRO-REBAR CONCRETE REINFORCEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.12.2018
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.12.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 30.01.2019  [2019/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pinkerton, Luke
804 Berkshire
Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US
For all designated states
Stecher, Joseph, L.
4928 Logan Avenue South
Minneapolis, MN 55419 / US
For all designated states
Novak, Jeffrey
1594 Stoddard Court
Kennesaw, GA 30152 / US
[2015/44]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2015/44]
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/44]Solf, Annkathrin
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date13865800.018.12.2013
[2015/44]
WO2013US76061
Priority number, dateUS201261738483P18.12.2012         Original published format: US 201261738483 P
[2015/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014100142
Date:26.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2935718
Date:28.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014
[2015/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR26.06.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:E04C5/02, G01B5/30
[2015/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/44]
TitleGerman:MIKRO-REBAR-BETONVERSTÄRKUNGSSYSTEM[2015/44]
English:MICRO-REBAR CONCRETE REINFORCEMENT SYSTEM[2015/44]
French:SYSTÈME DE MICRO-RENFORT DU BÉTON AU MOYEN D'UNE BARRE D'ARMATURE[2015/44]
Entry into regional phase15.07.2015National basic fee paid 
15.07.2015Search fee paid 
15.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
15.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/44]
02.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/05]
20.12.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.09.2019
26.09.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.06.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
08.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]US6060163  (NAAMAN ANTOINE E [US]) [X] 3-6 * figures 8a-b *
 [X]GB252975  (ALEXANDER GEORGE ROTINOFF) [X] 3-6 * figure 5 *
 [X]WO0206607  (ATLANTIC FIBER TECHNOLOGIES LT [CA]; GRACE W R & CO [US]; BURKE SEAN [) [X] 3-6 * figures 1-2 *
 [X]DE19835075  (EMAMI ARMAN [DE]) [X] 3-6 * figures 7-10 *
 [I]  - Ivan Markovic, "High-Performance Hybrid-Fibre Concrete - Development and Utilisation", Delft, Netherlands, (20060116), pages 1 - 211, URL: http://repository.tudelft.nl/assets/uuid:44ed51cd-fc27-4353-ab81-cf8348f52443/ceg_markovic_20060116.pdf, (20160629), XP055284342 [I] 2 * page 44 * * page 66 - page 69 * * page 82 - page 85 *
 [I]  - Supat W Suwannakarn ET AL, "Post-cracking characteristics of high performance fiber reinforced cementitious composites", ISBN 978-1-109-11843-8, (20090101), URL: http://deepblue.lib.umich.edu/bitstream/handle/2027.42/62327/supatws_1.pdf?sequence=1, (20160629), XP055284345 [I] 2 * page 33 - page 40 *
 [X]  - Ammar Abid ET AL, "Design of Fibre Reinforced Concrete Beams and Slabs", Göteborg, Sweden, (20110101), pages 1 - 112, URL: http://publications.lib.chalmers.se/records/fulltext/146607.pdf, (20160629), XP055284338 [X] 1,7 * page 1 *
 [A]US6060163  (NAAMAN, ANTOINE E.)
 [A]US2009075076  (LI ET AL.)
 [A]US2003044592  (PEREZ ET AL.)
 [A]US2005129931  (PILAKOUTAS ET AL.)
 [A]KR20110065829  (KOREA INSTITUTE OF CONSTRUCTION TECHNOLOGY)