Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800333

EP2800333 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING AN E-MAIL BOMB [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/45]METHOD, APPARATUS AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING E-MAIL BOMB
[2015/42]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2016/14]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / JIANG, Wu
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / DONG, Xingshui
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Thun, Clemens
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date13866926.225.12.2013
[2016/14]
WO2013CN90383
Priority number, dateCN20121057928527.12.2012         Original published format: CN201210579285
[2014/45]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014101758
Date:03.07.2014
Language:ZH
[2014/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800333
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2800333
Date:06.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN03.07.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L12/58, G06F21/55
[2015/11]
Former International [2014/45]H04L29/06, H04L12/58
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND GERÄT ZUR ERKENNUNG VON E-MAIL-BOMBEN[2014/45]
English:METHOD, APPARATUS AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING AN E-MAIL BOMB[2015/42]
French:PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA DÉTECTION D'UN BOMBARDEMENT DE COURRIER ÉLECTRONIQUE[2015/42]
Former [2014/45]METHOD, APPARATUS AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING E-MAIL BOMB
Former [2014/45]PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA DÉTECTION D'UN BOMBARDEMENT DE MESSAGERIE
Entry into regional phase31.07.2014Translation filed 
31.07.2014National basic fee paid 
31.07.2014Search fee paid 
31.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
15.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2016Fee for grant paid
25.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.10.2015
Opposition(s)10.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.12.2013
AL06.04.2016
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
TR06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
IE25.12.2016
LU25.12.2016
MT25.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU25.12.2013
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
TR06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
IE25.12.2016
LU25.12.2016
MT25.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/43]HU25.12.2013
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
IE25.12.2016
LU25.12.2016
MT25.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/38]HU25.12.2013
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
IE25.12.2016
LU25.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/30]HU25.12.2013
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
IE25.12.2016
LU25.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/49]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
IE25.12.2016
LU25.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/47]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/11]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/48]LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
Former [2016/44]NL06.04.2016
Cited inInternational search[I]US2006137009  (CHESLA AVI [IL]) [I] 1-13 * paragraphs [0034] , [0047] , [0111] , [0181] , [0183] * * figure 3 *
 [I]  - BO-CHAO CHENG ET AL, SIPS: A Stateful and Flow-Based Intrusion Prevention System for Email Applications, NETWORK AND PARALLEL COMPUTING; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 334 - 343, (20070918), ISBN 978-3-540-74783-3, XP019070022 [I] 1-13 * page 1, introduction * * page 3, sections 3 and 3.1 * * page 6, second paragraph * * figure 2; table 1 *
 [XP]CN103078752  (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.)
 [X]CN101540773  (CHENGDU HUAWEI SYMANTEC TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.)
 [A]CN101119321  (HANGZHOU H3C TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.)
 [A]US7716297  (PROOFPINT, INC.)