Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2897551

EP2897551 - JIGS FOR PLACING DENTAL IMPLANT ANALOGS IN MODELS AND METHODS OF DOING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet 3i, LLC
4555 Riverside Drive
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410 / US
[2017/23]
Former [2015/31]For all designated states
Biomet 3i, LLC
4555 Riverside Drive
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SUTTIN, Zachary, B.
10436 Orchid Reserve Drive
West Palm Beach, Florida 33412 / US
 [2015/31]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2017/23]
Former [2015/31]Guardian IP Consulting I/S
Diplomvej, Building 381
2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK
Application number, filing date13867717.409.12.2013
[2017/23]
WO2013US73864
Priority number, dateUS20121372775027.12.2012         Original published format: US201213727750
[2015/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014105406
Date:03.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2897551
Date:29.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2014
[2015/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2897551
Date:07.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.07.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61C13/00, A61C13/34, A61C1/08, A61C13/225, A61C13/12, A61C8/00
[2017/01]
Former International [2015/42]A61C8/00, A61C13/12, A61C13/23, A61C1/08, A61C13/34
Former International [2015/31]A61C8/00, A61C13/12, A61C13/23
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR DIE POSITIONIERUNG VON ZAHNIMPLANTATSANALOGA IN MODELLE UND VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DAVON[2015/31]
English:JIGS FOR PLACING DENTAL IMPLANT ANALOGS IN MODELS AND METHODS OF DOING THE SAME[2015/31]
French:GABARITS POUR POSITIONNER DES ANALOGUES D'IMPLANT DENTAIRE DANS DES MODÈLES ET PROCÉDÉS DE RÉALISATION ASSOCIÉS[2015/31]
Entry into regional phase24.04.2015National basic fee paid 
24.04.2015Search fee paid 
24.04.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
24.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/31]
12.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.2017Fee for grant paid
26.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17174632.4  / EP3348226
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.10.2015
Opposition(s)08.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.12.2013
AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
LU09.12.2017
MT09.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2019/30]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
LU09.12.2017
MT09.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
Former [2018/50]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
LU09.12.2017
MT09.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
LU09.12.2017
MT09.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/21]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/11]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/10]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2017/52]ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2017/50]ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2017/49]ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2012095851  (CADENT LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,13,14 * figures 14a-c * * the whole document *;
 [Y]TWM442135U  (TAIWAN IMPLANT TECHNOLOGY COMPANY [TW]) [Y] 1-3,5-8,13,14 * figures 1,4 *;
 US2014057227  [ ] (CHENG YING-LUNG [TW], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1,4 *;
 [Y]US2011200970  (BERCKMANS III BRUCE [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-8,13,14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2010035201  (BECK ISRAEL [IL], et al) [A] 1
International search[X]WO2012095851  (CADENT LTD [IL], et al);
 [X]US2011200970  (BERCKMANS III BRUCE [US], et al);
 [X]US2010021859  (KOPELMAN AVI [US]);
 [A]US2011183289  (POWELL THEODORE M [US], et al);
 [A]US2005177266  (KOPELMAN AVI [IL], et al);
 [A]US2011151399  (DE CLERCK RENE [BE], et al);
 [A]US2006127856  (WEN HUAFENG [US])