Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2897551 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2897551



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 281
11.04.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
07.06.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
11.05.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.04.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.04.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
26.04.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
26.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.03.2017 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
20.12.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.12.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.12.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.12.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
20.12.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 32
22.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
22.04.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
22.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.04.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
21.04.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
06.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.04.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
19.02.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
15.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.02.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.10.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
12.10.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.09.2015 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
14.09.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.09.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
03.09.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
17.08.2015 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
31.07.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.07.2015 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
07.07.2015 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 11
01.07.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.05.2015 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 18
24.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.04.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
24.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
24.04.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
24.04.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
18.11.2014 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
21.08.2014 Republication of A1/A2 Pamphlet -amended claims and/or statement Search / examination 8
22.07.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 54
03.07.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
03.07.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 40