Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2897551


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2019  [2019/52]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
13.04.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  16.05.2018  [2018/20]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
08.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
15.06.2017 (Expected) grant published on  07.06.2017  [2017/23]
09.06.2017 Change - divisional application(s) published on  12.07.2017  [2017/28]
02.05.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.04.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
28.04.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
19.12.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.12.2016 Change - classification published on  04.01.2017  [2017/01]
02.12.2016 Change - classification published on  04.01.2017  [2017/01]
25.04.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
18.04.2016 Change - representative
04.03.2016 Change - extension states published on  06.04.2016  [2016/14]
16.02.2016 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.10.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.10.2015 First examination report
11.09.2015 Change - classification published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
11.09.2015 Change - classification published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
11.09.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
26.06.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
26.06.2015 Request for examination filed published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
20.05.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
29.04.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
29.04.2015 Amendment by applicant
25.04.2015 Change - representative
25.04.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
19.11.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
04.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication