Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2897551 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP13867717 EP17174632



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10092379Global Dossier 09.10.2018B2
US2015111179 23.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201414560930 04.12.2014
US201213727750 27.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3348226Global Dossier 26.09.2018A3
EP3348226 18.07.2018A2
Priority number Date
EP13867717 09.12.2013
US201213727750 27.12.2012
WO2013US73864 09.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2897551Global Dossier 07.06.2017B1
EP2897551 14.10.2015A4
EP2897551 29.07.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201213727750 27.12.2012
WO2013US73864 09.12.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014105406Global Dossier 21.08.2014A4
WO2014105406 03.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201213727750 27.12.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US8926328Global Dossier 06.01.2015B2
US2014186796 03.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201213727750 27.12.2012
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3348226