Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2938657

EP2938657 - SULFUR-FREE, ZINC-FREE CURE SYSTEM FOR HALOBUTYL AND HALOGEN CONTAINING POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.12.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arlanxeo Singapore Pte. Ltd.
3A International Business Park
07-10/18, Icon@IPB
Singapore 609935 / SG
[2019/33]
Former [2016/46]For all designated states
Arlanxeo Singapore Pte. Ltd.
3A International Business Park
07-10/18, Icon@IPB
Singapore 609935 / SG
Former [2015/45]For all designated states
Lanxess Butyl Pte. Ltd.
3A International Business Park
No. 07-10/18, Tower B
Singapore 609935 / SG
Inventor(s)01 / NGUYEN, Paul
1717 Mickleborough Drive
London, Ontario N6G 5R7 / CA
02 / ARSENAULT, Gilles
1225 Elson Road
London, Ontario N6G 0C2 / CA
 [2015/45]
Representative(s)Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
[2019/33]
Former [2015/45]Deblon, Jörg-Stephan
LANXESS Deutschland GmbH
Kennedyplatz 1
50569 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date13868260.419.12.2013
[2015/45]
WO2013CA01065
Priority number, dateUS201261745858P26.12.2012         Original published format: US 201261745858 P
[2015/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014100890
Date:03.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2938657
Date:04.11.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2014
[2015/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2938657
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA03.07.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:C08J3/24, C08C19/32, C08F210/12, C08F8/40, C08K5/50
[2015/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHWEFELFREIES ZINKFREIES HÄRTUNGSSYSTEM FÜR HALOBUTYL- UND HALOGENHALTIGE POLYMERE[2015/45]
English:SULFUR-FREE, ZINC-FREE CURE SYSTEM FOR HALOBUTYL AND HALOGEN CONTAINING POLYMERS[2015/45]
French:SYSTÈME DE SOLIDIFICATION SANS SOUFRE ET SANS ZINC DE POLYMÈRES CONTENANT DE L'HALOBUTYLE ET DES HALOGÈNES[2015/45]
Entry into regional phase27.07.2015National basic fee paid 
27.07.2015Search fee paid 
27.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
27.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/45]
17.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
27.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2019Fee for grant paid
03.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.12.2017
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
27.04.2017Request for further processing filed
27.04.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.05.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US2005245649  (PARENT JOHN S [CA], et al) [A] 1-14;
 [A]US2007203306  (RESENDES RUI [CA], et al) [A] 1-14
International search[A]WO2012075573  (UNIV KINGSTON [CA], et al);
 [A]US6525128  (ZANZIG DAVID JOHN [US])
 [X]  - PARENT, J. SCOTT;, "IMIDAZOLIUM BROMIDE DERIVATIVES OF POLY(ISOBUTYLENE-CO-ISOPRENE): A NEW CLASS OFELASTOMERIC IONOMERS", POLYMER, (2011), vol. 52, no. 24, pages 5410 - 5418, XP028100980

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymer.2011.10.021