Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2799999

EP2799999 - DEVICE CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING DEVICE CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/45]DEVICE CONTROL SYSTEM, PRINTER, AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING DEVICE CONTROL SYSTEM
[2019/43]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.10.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAKASU, Kazuhiro
c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
3-5 Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP
02 / TSUTSUMI, Koichiro
c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
3-5 Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP
03 / IKEDA, Shigeo
c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
3-5 Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date13870202.226.12.2013
WO2013JP07625
Priority number, dateUS201361748232P02.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361748232 P
[2014/45]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014106882
Date:10.07.2014
Language:JA
[2014/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2799999
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.07.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/00, G06F3/12, G06Q20/20
[2015/50]
Former International [2014/45]G06F13/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGSSTEUERSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES VORRICHTUNGSSTEUERSYSTEMS[2019/43]
English:DEVICE CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING DEVICE CONTROL SYSTEM[2019/43]
French:SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF[2019/43]
Former [2014/45]VORRICHTUNGSSTEUERSYSTEM, DRUCKER UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES VORRICHTUNGSSTEUERSYSTEMS
Former [2014/45]DEVICE CONTROL SYSTEM, PRINTER, AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING DEVICE CONTROL SYSTEM
Former [2014/45]SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF, IMPRIMANTE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF
Entry into regional phase30.07.2014Translation filed 
30.07.2014National basic fee paid 
30.07.2014Search fee paid 
30.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
05.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.09.2019
18.09.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
14.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
06.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
05.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
05.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0991227  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-5,12,13,16,20,21 * the whole document * [I] 6-11,14,15,17-19;
 [XP]EP2631808  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [XP] 19 * the whole document *
International search[X]JP2012173910  (SEIKO EPSON CORP);
 [Y]JP2007188468  (RICOH KK);
 [Y]JP2007328558  (RICOH KK);
 [A]JP2005045437  (FUJI XEROX CO LTD);
 [A]JP2002176675  (SEIKO EPSON CORP);
 [A]JP2003274100  (RICOH KK);
 [A]JP2010113606  (CANON IMAGING SYSTEMS INC)
by applicantJP2004152256