Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2943241 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2943241



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 161
27.05.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
18.04.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.04.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
01.04.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
01.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.11.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
27.11.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.11.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.11.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
27.11.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 24
25.09.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
14.06.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
09.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.01.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
09.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
09.01.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
09.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.07.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
14.06.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.06.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 2
14.06.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
14.06.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
30.05.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
23.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.02.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
23.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
23.02.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
23.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.01.2016 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
21.10.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
19.10.2015 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2015 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
11.09.2015 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
09.09.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.08.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
28.07.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
02.06.2015 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
22.05.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
17.07.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
17.07.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 26