Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2943241


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.12.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.01.2020 [2020/01]
22.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2019 [2019/52]
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
13.11.2019 Change - representative
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019 [2019/50]
01.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2019  [2019/49]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019  [2019/48]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
12.04.2019 (Expected) grant published on  15.05.2019  [2019/20]
05.04.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
05.04.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
03.04.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
04.02.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.11.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.01.2017 Amendment by applicant
15.06.2016 Supplementary search report published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
10.06.2016 Change - classification published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
10.06.2016 Change - classification published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
11.03.2016 Change - extension states published on  13.04.2016  [2016/15]
29.02.2016 Amendment by applicant
05.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.01.2016 Change - inventor published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
16.10.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.11.2015  [2015/47]
16.10.2015 Request for examination filed published on  18.11.2015  [2015/47]
25.09.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
04.09.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
04.09.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.08.2015 Change - representative
11.08.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
19.06.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
16.06.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
29.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication