Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2943241

EP2943241 - MULTI-FUNCTION OXYGEN MASK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rollins Medical Solutions, Inc.
1930 Village Center Cir., 3-314
Las Vegas, NV 89134 / US
[2015/47]
Inventor(s)01 / ROLLINS, Offord L., III
1930 Village Center Circle, 3-314
Las Vegas, NV 89134 / US
 [2016/07]
Former [2015/47]01 / ROLLINS, Oford, III
1390 Village Center Circle, PMB 3-314
Las Vegas, NV 89134 / US
Representative(s)ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Rambla Catalunya, 123
08008 Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [2015/47]ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1
08002 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date13871043.910.01.2013
[2015/47]
WO2013US21016
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014109749
Date:17.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2943241
Date:18.11.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2014
[2015/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2943241
Date:15.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR17.07.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/06, A61M16/16, A61M16/08, A61M11/06
[2016/28]
Former International [2015/47]A61M16/06, A61M16/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MULTIFUNKTIONELLE SAUERSTOFFMASKE[2015/47]
English:MULTI-FUNCTION OXYGEN MASK[2015/47]
French:MASQUE À OXYGÈNE MULTIFONCTIONS[2015/47]
Entry into regional phase10.08.2015National basic fee paid 
10.08.2015Search fee paid 
10.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
10.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/47]
09.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2019Fee for grant paid
01.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.11.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL15.05.2019
ES15.05.2019
FI15.05.2019
HR15.05.2019
LT15.05.2019
LV15.05.2019
NL15.05.2019
RS15.05.2019
SE15.05.2019
BG15.08.2019
NO15.08.2019
GR16.08.2019
PT15.09.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/50]AL15.05.2019
ES15.05.2019
FI15.05.2019
HR15.05.2019
LT15.05.2019
LV15.05.2019
NL15.05.2019
RS15.05.2019
SE15.05.2019
NO15.08.2019
GR16.08.2019
PT15.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL15.05.2019
ES15.05.2019
FI15.05.2019
HR15.05.2019
LT15.05.2019
NL15.05.2019
SE15.05.2019
NO15.08.2019
PT15.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES15.05.2019
FI15.05.2019
LT15.05.2019
SE15.05.2019
NO15.08.2019
PT15.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES15.05.2019
FI15.05.2019
LT15.05.2019
NO15.08.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]US2008210242  (BURK MARC ALAN [US] ET AL) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0024] - [0 42] - [0044] *;
 [A]US5586551  (HILLIARD KENNETH R [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *;
 [A]US2002073995  (RUBIN DARREN [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *;
 [A]US2008087280  (DHUPER SUNIL K [US] ET AL) [A] 1-13 * abstract *;
 [E]WO2013112470  (AEON RES AND TECNOLOGY LLC [US]) [E] 1-13 * abstract *
International search[X]US2008210242  (BURK, M. A. ET AL.);
 [A]US2012216806  (ROOKARD, T. ET AL.);
 [A]US2012285455  (VARGA, C. M. ET AL.);
 [A]US2012240924  (RUSTAD, A. M.);
 [A]US2008230072  (ROLLINS, 0. L. ET AL.)