Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2830148

EP2830148 - WAVEGUIDE FILTER, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR, AND COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.05.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.06.2016  [2016/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian, Longgang
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / ZHOU, Yanzhao
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / DAI, Yufeng
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / WEI, Xiang
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schlossschmidstrasse 5
80639 München / DE
[2015/05]
Application number, filing date13873134.426.09.2013
WO2013CN84266
Priority number, dateCN2013119839324.05.2013         Original published format: CN201310198393
[2015/05]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014187055
Date:27.11.2014
Language:ZH
[2014/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2830148
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN27.11.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01P1/208, H01P11/00
[2015/20]
Former International [2015/05]H01P1/208
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WELLENLEITERFILTER, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG[2015/05]
English:WAVEGUIDE FILTER, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR, AND COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE[2015/05]
French:FILTRE DE GUIDE D'ONDES, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ, ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase01.08.2014Translation filed 
01.08.2014National basic fee paid 
01.08.2014Search fee paid 
01.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
17.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/23]
08.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/23]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US5821836  (KATEHI LINDA P B [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,9,12 * column 2, line 44 - column 5, line 15; figures 1-3 * * column 6, line 3 - line 26 * [Y] 6-8,10,11 [I] 5,13,14;
 [XYI]WO2004045018  (SOPHIA WIRELESS INC [US]; KOH PHILIP J [US]; NEMETH DAVID T [US]) [X] 9-12 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0053]; figures 1,3a * [Y] 6-8 [I] 1-5,13,14;
 [Y]US2010308925  (SONG SANG SUB [KR] ET AL) [Y] 6,7 * paragraph [0067] *;
 [Y]JP2004253997  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [Y] 8 * abstract *
 [XYI]  - KEVIN M K H LEONG ET AL, "WR1.5 Silicon Micromachined Waveguide Components and Active Circuit Integration Methodology", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20120401), vol. 60, no. 4, doi:10.1109/TMTT.2012.2184296, ISSN 0018-9480, pages 998 - 1005, XP011439783 [X] 1,4,5,9,11 * paragraph [00I.] - paragraph [III.]; figures 1,3,7 * [Y] 6-8,10,11 [I] 12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMTT.2012.2184296
International search[XP]CN103326094  (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.);
 [X]CN102856615  (UNIVERSITY OF ELECTRONIC SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY OF CHINA);
 [A]CN102361113  (THE 13TH RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF CHINA ELETRONICS TECHNOLOGY GROUP CORPO);
 [A]US2010308925  (SEOUL NATIONAL UNIVERSITY INDUSTRY FOUNDATION)