Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2952076

EP2952076 - LIQUID COOLING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX 77070 / US
[2019/44]
Former [2016/25]For all designated states
Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX 77070 / US
Former [2015/50]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive W.
Houston, Texas 77070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FRANZ, John P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, Texas 77070 / US
02 / CADER, Tahir
P.O. Box 683
Liberty Lake, Washington 99019 / US
03 / SABOTTA, Michael L.
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, Texas 77070 / US
04 / MOORE, David A.
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, Texas 77070 / US
 [2015/50]
Representative(s)Iqbal, Md Mash-Hud
Marks & Clerk LLP
62-68 Hills Road
Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB
[2019/44]
Former [2015/50]EIP
Fairfax House
15 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date13873193.031.01.2013
[2015/50]
WO2013US24037
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014120182
Date:07.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2952076
Date:09.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2014
[2015/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2952076
Date:30.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR07.08.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:H05K7/20, H01L23/46, H01L23/473, F28F1/40
[2016/38]
Former International [2015/50]H05K7/20, H01L23/46
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLÜSSIGKEITSKÜHLUNG[2015/50]
English:LIQUID COOLING[2015/50]
French:REFROIDISSEMENT DE LIQUIDE[2015/50]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2015National basic fee paid 
30.06.2015Search fee paid 
30.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/50]
12.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2019Fee for grant paid
19.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.05.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
24.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
24.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2011079376  (LOONG SY-JENQ [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 3-6,10-13;
 [XI]US2005199372  (FRAZER JAMES T [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 3-6,10-13;
 [XI]US2007163749  (MIYAHARA HIDEYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,7-9,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 3-6,10-13;
 [I]US5829514  (SMITH DEAN L [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2009266515  (OIKAWA HIRONORI [JP]);
 [Y]JP2000059062  (FUJITSU LTD);
 [Y]JP2010004736  (STANFORD RES INST INT);
 [Y]US6111749  (LAMB CHARLES ROBERT [US], et al);
 [A]US2009065178  (KASEZAWA YOSHIMASA [JP], et al)
ExaminationJP2012248576
 JP2004295718
 US2002021557
by applicantUS2011079376
 US2005199372
 JP2012248576