blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2952447

EP2952447 - FOAM DISCHARGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.04.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 03.08.2022  [2022/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd.
2-6 Ojima 3-chome
Koto-ku
Tokyo 136-8531 / JP
[2015/50]
Inventor(s)01 / KAKUTA Yoshiyuki
c/o YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO., LTD.
2-6, Ojima 3-chome
Koto-ku
Tokyo 136-8531 / JP
 [2015/50]
Representative(s)Lavoix
Bayerstraße 83
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/23]Lavoix
Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
Former [2015/50]Tischner, Oliver
Lavoix Munich
Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date13873523.822.11.2013
[2015/50]
WO2013JP81517
Priority number, dateJP2013001757331.01.2013         Original published format: JP 2013017573
[2015/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014119102
Date:07.08.2014
Language:JA
[2014/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2952447
Date:09.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2952447
Date:05.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.08.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2016
ClassificationIPC:B65D47/34, B05B11/00, B65D83/76, B05B7/00
[2016/08]
CPC:
B05B7/0031 (EP,US); B05B9/04 (CN); B05B11/1087 (EP,US);
B05B11/0064 (EP,US); B05B11/0075 (EP,US); B05B11/1001 (EP,US);
B05B15/00 (CN); B05B7/0018 (US); B05B9/0403 (CN);
B05B11/1047 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2015/50]B65D47/34, B05B11/00, B65D83/76
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHAUMSPENDEVORRICHTUNG[2015/50]
English:FOAM DISCHARGE DEVICE[2015/50]
French:DISPOSITIF DISTRIBUTEUR DE MOUSSE[2015/50]
Entry into regional phase05.08.2015Translation filed 
05.08.2015National basic fee paid 
05.08.2015Search fee paid 
05.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
05.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/50]
04.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2019Fee for grant paid
25.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.03.2017
Opposition(s)06.03.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.11.2013
AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CY05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
DK05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
MC05.06.2019
MK05.06.2019
MT05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
PL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SI05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
TR05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
IE22.11.2019
LU22.11.2019
BE30.11.2019
CH30.11.2019
LI30.11.2019
[2022/31]
Former [2021/34]HU22.11.2013
AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CY05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
DK05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
MC05.06.2019
MT05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
PL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SI05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
TR05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
IE22.11.2019
LU22.11.2019
BE30.11.2019
CH30.11.2019
LI30.11.2019
Former [2021/32]HU22.11.2013
AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CY05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
DK05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
MC05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
PL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SI05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
TR05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
IE22.11.2019
LU22.11.2019
BE30.11.2019
CH30.11.2019
LI30.11.2019
Former [2021/26]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CY05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
DK05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
MC05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
PL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SI05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
TR05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
IE22.11.2019
LU22.11.2019
BE30.11.2019
CH30.11.2019
LI30.11.2019
Former [2020/51]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
DK05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
MC05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
PL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SI05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
TR05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
IE22.11.2019
LU22.11.2019
BE30.11.2019
CH30.11.2019
LI30.11.2019
Former [2020/46]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
DK05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
MC05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
PL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SI05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
TR05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
IE22.11.2019
LU22.11.2019
CH30.11.2019
LI30.11.2019
Former [2020/36]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
DK05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
MC05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
PL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SI05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
TR05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
LU22.11.2019
CH30.11.2019
LI30.11.2019
Former [2020/35]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
DK05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
PL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SI05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
TR05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
LU22.11.2019
CH30.11.2019
LI30.11.2019
Former [2020/34]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
DK05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
PL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SI05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
TR05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
CH30.11.2019
LI30.11.2019
Former [2020/25]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
DK05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
PL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SI05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
TR05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/22]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
DK05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
TR05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/17]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
TR05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/13]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/12]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/11]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/10]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/09]AL05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2020/07]AL05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2019/51]AL05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH09323746  (KYORITSU KOGYO) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO2006090229  (TAPLAST SRL [IT], et al) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2007261688  (LION CORP) [A] 1,2* abstract *
International search[Y]JPS63151370  (KONDO HIROSHI);
 [Y]JPH09323746  (KYORITSU KOGYO);
 [Y]JPH11588  (PFEIFFER ERICH GMBH & CO KG);
 [Y]JPH11513308  (PARK TOWERS INTERNATIONAL B.V.);
 [Y]JP2007261688  (LION CORP);
 [Y]JP2008531254  (TAPLAST S.P.A.)
by applicantJP2009202122
 JP2013017573
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.