EP2955164 - LAMINATED GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | For all designated states Pilkington Group Limited European Technical Centre Hall Lane Lathom Nr. Ormskirk, Lancashire L40 5UF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/51] | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | ||
For all designated states Pilkington Group Limited European Technical Centre Hall Lane Lathom Nr. Ormskirk, Lancashire L40 5UF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGAWA, Hisashi c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO. LTD. 5-27 Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | 02 /
ASAOKA, Hisashi c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO. LTD. 5-27 Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | 03 /
CHAMBERLAIN, Mark A c/o PILKINGTON GROUP LIMITED European Technical Centre Hall Lane, Lathom Nr. Ormskirk Lancashire L40 5UF / GB | [2015/51] | Representative(s) | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | [2021/07] |
Former [2015/51] | Lecomte & Partners P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 13874579.9 | 30.10.2013 | [2015/51] | WO2013JP06445 | Priority number, date | JP20130020071 | 05.02.2013 Original published format: JP 2013020071 | [2015/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014122704 | Date: | 14.08.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2955164 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2955164 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, C03C27/12, H01L51/50, H05B33/02, H05B33/04, H05B33/06, H05B33/14, H01R4/02, H05B3/84 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
B32B17/10385 (EP,US);
B32B17/10036 (EP,US);
B32B17/10293 (EP,US);
B32B17/10467 (EP,US);
B32B17/10541 (EP,US);
B32B17/10651 (EP,US);
B32B17/10761 (EP,US);
B32B3/266 (US);
H05B3/06 (US);
H05B3/84 (US);
B32B2457/12 (EP,US);
B32B2457/20 (EP,US);
B32B2457/202 (EP,US);
B32B2457/206 (EP,US);
H10K50/805 (US);
H10K59/82 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/51] | C03C27/12, H01L51/50, H05B33/02, H05B33/04, H05B33/06, H05B33/14, H01R4/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDGLAS | [2015/51] | English: | LAMINATED GLASS | [2015/51] | French: | VERRE FEUILLETÉ | [2015/51] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2015 | Translation filed | 25.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/51] | 22.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2020 | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2013 | AL | 17.02.2021 | AT | 17.02.2021 | CY | 17.02.2021 | CZ | 17.02.2021 | DK | 17.02.2021 | EE | 17.02.2021 | ES | 17.02.2021 | FI | 17.02.2021 | HR | 17.02.2021 | IT | 17.02.2021 | LT | 17.02.2021 | LV | 17.02.2021 | MC | 17.02.2021 | NL | 17.02.2021 | PL | 17.02.2021 | RO | 17.02.2021 | RS | 17.02.2021 | SE | 17.02.2021 | SI | 17.02.2021 | SK | 17.02.2021 | SM | 17.02.2021 | BG | 17.05.2021 | NO | 17.05.2021 | GR | 18.05.2021 | IS | 17.06.2021 | PT | 17.06.2021 | IE | 30.10.2021 | LU | 30.10.2021 | BE | 31.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 30.10.2013 | |
AL | 17.02.2021 | ||
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
IE | 30.10.2021 | ||
LU | 30.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
IE | 30.10.2021 | ||
LU | 30.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
LU | 30.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
LU | 30.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4321296 (ROUGIER GILLES) [A] 1-3 * column 5, line 14 - line 27; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0267331 (DONNELLY CORP [US]) [Y] 4,7,9,10,13,14 * page 6, column 9, line 17 - page 7, column 11, line 54; figures 6,6A,10,15 *; | [A]EP0385791 (PILKINGTON PLC [GB]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 37 *; | [A]US2002005398 (GILLNER MANFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1688284 (AUTOMOTIVE COMPONENTS HOLDINGS [US]) [A] 1-3 * figure -; claim - *; | [Y]WO2007122426 (PILKINGTON GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 4,7,9,10,13,14 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2,3,5,12,16 *; | [A]WO2008047164 (PILKINGTON GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 10 - page 4, line 18 *; | [A]EP2025509 (AGC FLAT GLASS EUROPE SA [BE]) [A] 4,7,9-14* paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022]; figure 1; claim - *; | [AD]US2009277671 (HAHN HERBERT [DE]) [AD] 1-3 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0029]; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2010224235 (TAKAGI NAOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0097] * | International search | [A]JPH0843863 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPH10253995 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD); | [A]JPH1126911 (NIPPON KOKUEN KOGYO KK); | [A]JP2001048602 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [A]JP2006503788 (SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE); | [A]JP2007326763 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2002319694 | JP2005078992 | JP2010500703 |