Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2818533

EP2818533 - LIQUID CRYSTAL COMPOSITION AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY ELEMENT EMPLOYING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.02.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DIC Corporation
35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku
Tokyo 174-8520 / JP
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / KAWAMURA, Joji
c/o DIC Corporation, Saitama Plant,
4472-1, Oaza Komuro, Ina-machi
Kitaadachi-gun, Saitama 3628577 / JP
02 / NEGISHI, Makoto
c/o DIC Corporation, Saitama Plant,
4472-1, Oaza Komuro, Ina-machi
Kitaadachi-gun, Saitama 3628577 / JP
03 / IWASHITA, Yoshinori
c/o DIC Corporation, Saitama Plant,
4472-1, Oaza Komuro, Ina-machi
Kitaadachi-gun, Saitama 3628577 / JP
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Beckmann, Claus
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[2015/01]
Application number, filing date13874861.125.03.2013
[2017/20]
WO2013JP58578
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014155491
Date:02.10.2014
Language:JA
[2014/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2818533
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2818533
Date:17.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.10.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:C09K19/02, C09K19/20, C09K19/30, C09K19/12, C09K19/44, C09K19/34, C09K19/04
[2017/10]
Former International [2015/49]C09K19/42, C09K19/20, C09K19/30, G02F1/13, C09K19/44, C09K19/04, C09K19/12, C09K19/34
Former International [2015/01]C09K19/42, C09K19/20, C09K19/30, G02F1/13
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/20]
Former [2015/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLÜSSIGKRISTALLZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEELEMENT DAMIT[2015/01]
English:LIQUID CRYSTAL COMPOSITION AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY ELEMENT EMPLOYING SAME[2015/01]
French:COMPOSITION DE CRISTAUX LIQUIDES ET ÉLÉMENT D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES L'UTILISANT[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase20.08.2014Translation filed 
20.08.2014National basic fee paid 
20.08.2014Search fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/14]
06.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2017Fee for grant paid
05.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.08.2016
Opposition(s)20.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
[2018/52]
Former [2018/25]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/52]AT17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[I]EP2508588  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0133]; examples 4,11; claims 1-12 *;
 [A]EP2457975  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * examples M10,M13; claims 1-13 *;
 [A]WO2012079676  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * example M7; claims 1-20 *
International search[X]JP2008545804  (MERCK PATENT GMBH);
 [X]WO2011065299  (JNC CORP [JP], et al);
 [X]WO2010131614  (CHISSO CORP [JP], et al);
 [X]DE102004019901  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]);
 [X]JP2008255201  (CHISSO CORP, et al);
 [X]WO2008102641  (CHISSO CORP [JP], et al)
by applicantJP2008037918
 JP2008038018
 JP2010275390
 JP2011052120