Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2818533 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2818533



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2512
23.03.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
18.05.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.04.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.04.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.04.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
05.04.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
05.04.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.02.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.02.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
15.02.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
15.02.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 337
15.02.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 337
12.12.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 339
12.12.2016 Description Search / examination 330
12.12.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.08.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
03.08.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.04.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
06.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
06.04.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
06.04.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 8
11.01.2016 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
05.01.2016 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
17.11.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
30.10.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.10.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.10.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.10.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.10.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
30.10.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
19.10.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
13.10.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
13.10.2015 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
03.12.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
17.10.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
02.10.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
02.10.2014 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
02.10.2014 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 295
24.09.2014 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
22.09.2014 Annex Search / examination 295
22.09.2014 Annex Search / examination 1
22.09.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 3
22.09.2014 Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) Search / examination 1
22.09.2014 Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Information regarding early processing Search / examination 2
20.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.08.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
20.08.2014 Claims Search / examination 25
20.08.2014 Description Search / examination 440
20.08.2014 Drawings Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5