Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2818533


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
23.03.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  25.04.2018  [2018/17]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
08.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
14.04.2017 (Expected) grant published on  17.05.2017  [2017/20]
11.04.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
11.04.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
11.04.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
25.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.02.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
03.02.2017 Change - classification published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
03.02.2017 Change - classification published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
14.12.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
12.08.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.08.2016 First examination report
27.05.2016 Change - extension states published on  29.06.2016  [2016/26]
22.04.2016 Amendment by applicant
14.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.11.2015 Change - classification published on  02.12.2015  [2015/49]
04.11.2015 Change - classification published on  02.12.2015  [2015/49]
04.11.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  02.12.2015  [2015/49]
13.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.02.2015 Change - designated states published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
27.02.2015 Change - request for examination published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
28.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
28.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
23.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
07.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.08.2014 Amendment by applicant
21.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication