Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2950499

EP2950499 - 802.1X ACCESS SESSION KEEPALIVE METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.07.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2018/37]
Former [2015/49]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / LIANG, Qiandeng
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / FAN, Liang
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2015/49]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2015/49]
Application number, filing date13875702.617.09.2013
[2015/49]
WO2013CN83699
Priority number, dateCN2013105306419.02.2013         Original published format: CN201310053064
[2015/49]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014127630
Date:28.08.2014
Language:ZH
[2014/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2950499
Date:02.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2950499
Date:12.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN28.08.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04W12/06, H04L29/08, H04W84/12, H04W76/25, H04W76/19
[2018/16]
Former International [2016/03]H04L29/06, H04W12/06
Former International [2015/49]H04L29/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:802.1X-ZUGRIFFSSITZUNG-KEEPALIVE-VERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM[2015/49]
English:802.1X ACCESS SESSION KEEPALIVE METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM[2015/49]
French:PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF, ET SYSTÈME DE MAINTIEN DE SESSION D'ACCÈS 802.1X[2015/49]
Entry into regional phase03.08.2015Translation filed 
28.08.2015National basic fee paid 
28.08.2015Search fee paid 
28.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/49]
05.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2018Fee for grant paid
30.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.04.2018
Opposition(s)13.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
DK12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
MC12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SI12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
IE17.09.2018
LU17.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
FR12.11.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
[2019/49]
Former [2019/40]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
DK12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
MC12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SI12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
IE17.09.2018
LU17.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/38]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
DK12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
MC12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SI12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
IE17.09.2018
LU17.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/37]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
DK12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
MC12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SI12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
IE17.09.2018
LU17.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/34]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
DK12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
MC12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
IE17.09.2018
LU17.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/33]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
MC12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
IE17.09.2018
LU17.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/30]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
LU17.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
NO12.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT12.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2432265  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,2,9,10,17,18 * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0036] *;
 [I]US2009262682  (KHETAWAT AMIT [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * paragraph [0243] * * paragraph [0315] * * paragraph [0334] * * paragraph [0344] * * paragraph [0363] *;
 [A]US2008076420  (KHETAWAT AMIT [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0179] * * paragraph [0308] - paragraph [0309] * * paragraph [0313] * * paragraph [0323] *
International search[XP]CN103200172  (ZTE CORP);
 [X]CN1447570  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]);
 [Y]CN101232372  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]);
 [X]CN1476207  (BEIJING GANGWAN NETWORK CO LTD [CN]);
 [A]CN101834867  (HANGZHOU H3C TECH CO LTD)