Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2962642

EP2962642 - METHOD FOR DETECTING CAVITATION AND ULTRASONIC MEDICAL APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.12.2015
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alpinion Medical Systems Co., Ltd.
112-83, Annyeong-dong
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 445-380 / KR
[2016/01]
Inventor(s)01 / SON, Keonho
804-1503
Bu-yeong Apt.
956 Unjung-dong
Seongnam-si Bundang-gu Gyeonggi-do 463-440 / KR
02 / KANG, Kookjin
102-602
Hanil Apt.
Sinbong-dong
Suji-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-536 / KR
03 / KIM, Dae Seung
353-58
Hwagok 1-dong
Gangseo-gu
Seoul 157-882 / KR
04 / JUN, Sukhwan
403 Joeun Village
399-20
Juan-dong
Nam-gu
Incheon 402-200 / KR
 [2016/01]
Representative(s)Harden, Henry Simon , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/01]Thorniley, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date13876474.128.02.2013
[2016/01]
WO2013KR01670
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014133209
Date:04.09.2014
Language:KO
[2014/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2962642
Date:06.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.09.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B8/14, A61N7/00, A61B8/00
[2016/47]
Former International [2016/01]A61B8/14, A61N7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG EINER KAVITATION UND MEDIZINISCHE ULTRASCHALLVORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2016/01]
English:METHOD FOR DETECTING CAVITATION AND ULTRASONIC MEDICAL APPARATUS THEREFOR[2016/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE CAVITATION ET APPAREIL MÉDICAL ULTRASONORE CORRESPONDANT[2016/01]
Entry into regional phase25.09.2015Translation filed 
25.09.2015National basic fee paid 
25.09.2015Search fee paid 
25.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.2015Examination requested  [2016/01]
22.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US2010036291  (DARLINGTON GREGORY P [US] ET AL) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0037] - [0047] - [0056] *;
 [X]US2007038099  (SUGITA NAMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,8-12 * paragraphs [0043] - [0045] - [0055] , [0064] - [0070] - [0090] - [0099] - [0106]; figures 1-2 *;
 [XI]US6508774  (ACKER DAVID E [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 2 * * column 4, line 12 - line 38 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 45 * * column 11, line 13 - column 14, line 11 * * column 10, line 25 - line 44 * [I] 2-12;
 [XA]JP2013000269  (OLYMPUS CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-12;
 US2014107536  [ ] (MURAKAMI MIYUKI [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0029] - [0036] - [0040] - [0051] *;
 [A]CN201939899U  (BEIJING HUIFUKANG MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0044] , [0058] - [0073] - [0075] - [0079] - [0095] *;
 [A]WO2012042423  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; VIGNON FRANCOIS GUY GERARD MARIE) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 11, line 25 - page 12, line 8 *;
 [A]US2008177180  (AZHARI HAIM [IL] ET AL) [A] 1,11,12 * paragraphs [0025] , [0042] , [0206] - [0209]; figures 2,13a-b; claims 1,2,46-48 *
 [A]  - FROHLY J ET AL, "Ultrasonic cavitation monitoring by acoustic noise power measurement", THE JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS FOR THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20001101), vol. 108, no. 5, doi:10.1121/1.1312360, ISSN 0001-4966, pages 2012 - 2020, XP012001978 [A] 1-10 * page 2013, column right, paragraph 4 - page 2016, column left, paragraph 1; figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1121/1.1312360
International search[X]JP2009508649  (THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN);
 [Y]JP3754113B  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [A]KR20120010012  (SOGANG UNIVERSITY RESEARCH FOUNDATION);
 [A]US2005150830  (LANGHARN, JAMES A., JR, ET AL.);
 [A]JP2001327495  (SHIMADZU CORP)