Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2961460 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2961460



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 400
22.07.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
14.06.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.06.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
02.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.05.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
02.05.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
02.05.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
02.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.01.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
08.01.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
08.01.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
08.01.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 86
08.01.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 86
29.11.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.08.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
24.04.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
24.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
24.04.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 16
24.04.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 16
24.04.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
14.10.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
27.09.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.09.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 3
27.09.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
27.09.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
20.09.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
09.12.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.10.2015 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
06.10.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.09.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
31.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
31.08.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
31.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
31.08.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
31.08.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
08.07.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
22.09.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 30
04.09.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
04.09.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 87